Cloudeeva, Inc.
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Kathryn C Ferguson |
Case #: | 3:14-bk-24874 |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2014 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jun 28, 2016 |
Claims Deadline: | Sep 26, 2016 |
Converted: | May 26, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 14, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Cloudeeva, Inc.
104 Windsor Center Dr Ste 300
East Windsor, NJ 08520-1423 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Stephen Gray, Chapter 11 Trustee
Deloitte CRG 200 Berkeley Street
Boston, MA 02116 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Richard Honig
Hellring, Lindeman, Goldstein & Siegal One Gateway Center 8th Floor
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee, United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee One Newark Center Suite 2100
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
One Newark Center
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Docket last updated: 07/20/2014 8:00 PM EDT |
Monday, July 21, 2014 | ||
crditcrd
Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Mon 07/21 7:01 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 14-24874 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28323131, fee amount $ 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
utility
Case Assigned
Mon 07/21 7:08 PM
Case Assignment. (nrf) |
||
1 | 1
12
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 07/21 6:51 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Kenneth A. Rosen on behalf of Cloudeeva, Inc.. Schedule(s) due 08/4/2014. Statement of Financial Affairs due 08/4/2014. Incomplete Filings due by 08/4/2014. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 11/18/2014. (Rosen, Kenneth) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration
Mon 07/21 7:49 PM
Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 14-24874 14-24875 Filed by Jeffrey D. Prol on behalf of Cloudeeva, Inc.. (Prol, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
motion
Expedited Consideration of First Day Matters (For Ch. 11 Cases Only)
Mon 07/21 8:16 PM
Application for Expedited Consideration of First Day Matters Filed by Jeffrey D. Prol on behalf of Cloudeeva, Inc.. (Prol, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extend Time
Mon 07/21 8:29 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Missing Schedules Filed by Jeffrey D. Prol on behalf of Cloudeeva, Inc.. (Prol, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extend Time
Mon 07/21 8:32 PM
Motion to Extend Time For Other Reason re:(i) To File Their List of Creditors and (ii) authorizing the Debtors and or their Agent to (A) Prepare Consolidated Lists of Creditors and Interest Holders in Lieu of a Mailing Matrix, and (B) Mail Initial Notices Filed by Jeffrey D. Prol on behalf of Cloudeeva, Inc.. (Prol, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
motion
Motion (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable
Mon 07/21 8:42 PM
Motion re: Debtors Motion for an Order (i) Authorizing the Debtors to Continue and Maintain Their Existing Cash Management System, Bank Accounts and Business Forms, (ii) Modifying the Investment Guidelines, (iii) Providing the United States Trustee With a 60-Day Objection Period and (iv) Granting Related Relief Filed by Jeffrey D. Prol on behalf of Cloudeeva, Inc.. (Prol, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Motion (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable
Mon 07/21 8:50 PM
Motion re: Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (i) Prohibiting Utility Companies from Discontinuing, Altering or Refusing Service on Account of Pre-Petition Invoices, (ii) Approving the Debtors Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance of Future Payment, (iii) Establishing Procedures For Resolving Requests for Additional Adequate Assurance Filed by Jeffrey D. Prol on behalf of Cloudeeva, Inc.. (Prol, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - proposed Final Order | ||
8 | 8
misc
Support
Mon 07/21 9:28 PM
Declaration of Adesh Tyagi in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and First Day Pleadings in support of filed by Jeffrey D. Prol on behalf of Cloudeeva, Inc.. (Prol, Jeffrey) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Motion (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable
Mon 07/21 9:42 PM
Motion re: Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Debtors to Pay Certain Pre-Petition Claims of Certain Foreign Vendors Filed by Jeffrey D. Prol on behalf of Cloudeeva, Inc.. (Prol, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
motion
Motion (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable
Mon 07/21 9:47 PM
Motion re: Debtors Motion for Entry of Order Authorizing But Not Directing the Debtors to Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries and Related Obligations and Taxes, and (ii) Directing All Banks to Honor Checks and Transfers for Payment of Pre-Petition Employee Obligations Filed by Jeffrey D. Prol on behalf of Cloudeeva, Inc.. (Prol, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
motion
Motion (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable
Mon 07/21 9:52 PM
Motion re: Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Debtors to Pay Certain Pre-Petition Claims of Certain Critical Vendors Filed by Jeffrey D. Prol on behalf of Cloudeeva, Inc.. (Prol, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 proposed Interim Order | ||
Att: 2 proposed Final Order | ||
12 | 12
motion
Motion (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable
Mon 07/21 10:47 PM
Motion re: Motion for Approval of Proposed Factoring Agreement and Order Authorizing Immediate Financing Filed by Jeffrey D. Prol on behalf of Cloudeeva, Inc.. (Prol, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I | ||
Att: 10 proposed interim Order | ||
Att: 11 proposed Final Order | ||
13 | 13
motion
Retain Claims and Noticing Agent
Mon 07/21 11:07 PM
Motion for an Order Authorizing Debtor to Retain a Claims and Noticing Agent Filed by Jeffrey D. Prol on behalf of Cloudeeva, Inc.. (Prol, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Evan Gershbein | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
court
Notice of Missing Documents
Tue 07/22 6:42 PM
Notice of Missing Documents. . Missing Documents: Atty Disclosure Statement,List of All Creditors,Statement of Financial Affairs,Summary of Schedule,Corporate Resolution,Schedules A,B,D,E,F,G,H,. Incomplete Filings due by 8/4/2014. (wdr) |