Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-24874

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kathryn C Ferguson
Case #: 3:16-ap-01566
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2016
Terminated:Feb 06, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Venkat Maram
29 Milburne Lane
Robbinsville, NJ 08691
Represented By
Venkat Maram
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard B. Honig
Hellring Lindeman Goldstein & Siegal LLP One Gateway Center 8th Floor
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Bruce S. Etterman
Hellring Lindeman Goldstein & Siegal LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 08, 2017
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 02/09 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2017
12 12 order To Close Case Mon 02/06 4:05 PM
ORDER CLOSING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING (Case Number: 3:2016-ap-1566-KCF). Reason: Dismissed or settled without entry of judgment. Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/6/2017. (bwj)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard B. Honig
utility Close Adversary Case Mon 02/06 2:47 PM
Adversary Case (3:16-ap-1566) Closed. (ghm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
utility Terminate Deadline Wed 01/25 9:56 AM
Objection to notice of information Deadline Terminated, Reason: no objections filed (gan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2016
11 11 misc Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy Tue 12/27 3:39 PM
Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy re: Richard B. Honig, Chapter 7 Trustee (Trustee) for Cloudeeva, Inc. (Debtor) brought an action on fraudulent transfer claims against Venkat Maram (Maram), Adv. Pro. No. 16-1566 for $35,250.00. Maram asserted defenses against the Trustees claims. The Trustee settled these issues between the parties based on the foregoing, difficulties of proof and the costs of litigation and collection.. Hearing scheduled for 01/31/2017 at 11:00 a.m. Filed by Bruce S. Etterman on behalf of Richard B. Honig. Objections due by 01/24/2017. (Etterman, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 09/29 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 09/28/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2016
9 9 order Mediation Order Mon 09/26 4:10 PM
Amended Mediation Order. Jay L. Lubetkin added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/26/2016. (fed)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2016
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 09/17 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 09/16/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 09/17 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 09/16/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2016
6 6 order Joint Scheduling Order Wed 09/14 11:28 AM
Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/13/2016. Discovery due by 3/30/2017. Trial date set for 6/21/2017 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (fed)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Mediation Order Wed 09/14 11:26 AM
Mediation Order. Morris S. Bauer added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/13/2016. (fed)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Wed 09/14 3:58 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: MEDIATION ORDER AND JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER ENTERED Related [+] (ghm )
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, September 01, 2016
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/01 1:57 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Douglas G. Leney on behalf of Venkat Maram. (Leney, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2016
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/19 10:49 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Bruce S. Etterman on behalf of Richard B. Honig. (Etterman, Bruce)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 16-01566 Complaint by Richard B. Honig against Venkat Maram. Fee Amount $ 350.. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Attachments: # 1 Summons) filed by Plaintiff Richard B. Honig,2 Summons Issued to Richard Honig for Service on Venkat Maram Answer due on 8/5/2016 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/13/2016 at 02:00 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attachments) (wdr)
Wednesday, July 06, 2016
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 07/06 4:37 PM
Summons Issued to Richard Honig for Service on Venkat Maram Answer due on 8/5/2016 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/13/2016 at 02:00 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (wdr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Attachments
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/06 11:13 AM
Adversary case 16-01566 Complaint by Richard B. Honig against Venkat Maram. Fee Amount $ 350.. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Etterman, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Wed 07/06 11:29 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 16-01566 KCF] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A32357651, fee amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1