Honig v. Pimenta
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-24874
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-24874
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Kathryn C Ferguson |
Case #: | 3:16-ap-01568 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Sean Pimenta
310 Sunset Road
Skillman, NJ 08558 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard B. Honig
Hellring Lindeman Goldstein & Siegal LLP One Gateway Center 8th Floor
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sat 05/27 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/26/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
To Close Case
Wed 05/24 9:19 AM
Order to Close Case (Case Number: 3:2016-ap-1568-KCF). Reason: Settled. . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/24/2017. (ghm) |
|
utility
Close Adversary Case
Wed 05/24 9:21 AM
Adversary Case 16-01568 KCF) Closed. (ghm) |
||
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
utility
Terminate Deadline
Wed 05/17 10:33 AM
objection to notice of information Deadline Terminated, Reason: no objections filed (gan) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy
Fri 04/21 2:53 PM
Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy re: Richard B. Honig, Chapter 7 Trustee (Trustee) for Cloudeeva, Inc. (Debtor) brought an avoidance action against Sean Pimenta (Pimenta), Adv. Pro. No. 16-1568 for $12,900.00. The Trustee settled the action based upon the difficulties of proof and the costs of litigation and collection.. Hearing scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 11:00 am. Filed by Bruce S. Etterman on behalf of Richard B. Honig. Objections due by 05/16/2017. (Etterman, Bruce) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Mediation Report
Thu 03/30 4:46 PM
Mediation Report filed by Allen I Gorski on behalf of Allen I. Gorski. (Gorski, Allen) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Mediator's Acceptance of Appointment
Fri 02/03 9:18 AM
Mediator's Acceptance of Appointment filed by Allen I Gorski on behalf of Allen I. Gorski. (Gorski, Allen) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Thu 02/02 12:57 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 02/01/2017. (Admin.) |
|
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Thu 02/02 12:57 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/01/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Joint Scheduling Order
Fri 01/27 1:23 PM
Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/26/2017. Discovery due by 6/27/2017. Trial date set for 10/4/2017 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (slf) |
|
21 | 21
order
Mediation Order
Fri 01/27 1:22 PM
Mediation Order. Allen I. Gorski added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/26/2017. (slf) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 01/17 2:59 PM
Minute of 1/17/2017 OUTCOME: MEDIATION ORDER & JOINT ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS & TRIAIL TO BE SUBMITTED (ghm ) |
||
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/21 5:40 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Edward C. Logan on behalf of Sean Pimenta. (Logan, Edward) |
|
Saturday, December 17, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sun 12/18 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/17/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Vacate
Thu 12/15 10:23 AM
Order Granting Motion To Vacate Default and Permitting Defendant to File An Answer . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/15/2016. (ghm) |
|
court
Hearing Scheduled (Document)
Thu 12/15 10:26 AM
Hearing Scheduled. |
||
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 12/06 10:49 AM
Minute of 12/6/2016 OUTCOME: GRANTED (ghm ) |
||
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
court
Hearing Rescheduled (Document)
Tue 11/29 4:58 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 9:00 AM (incorrect time). . Hearing scheduled for 12/6/2016 at 10:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (slf) |
||
Friday, November 11, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sat 11/12 1:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/11/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Extend Time
Wed 11/09 5:23 PM
Order Denying Motion to Extend Time to Get Attorney to Reply, Without Prejudice , . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/9/2016. (slf) |
|
Tuesday, November 08, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Amended Motion
Tue 11/08 7:21 PM
Amended Motion. Reason for Amendment: corrected cert of service Filed by Sean Pimenta. (Logan, Edward) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Vacate
Tue 11/08 6:43 PM
Motion to Vacate Filed by Sean Pimenta.Hearing scheduled for 12/6/2016 at 09:00 AM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Logan, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Att: 3 Certification of Counsel in support | ||
court
Hearing Held
Wed 11/09 10:20 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (ghm ) |
||
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Opposition
Mon 10/24 10:59 AM
Brief in Opposition to motion for extension of time filed by Bruce S. Etterman on behalf of Richard B. Honig. (Etterman, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extend Time
Wed 10/12 4:01 PM
Motion to Extend Time re: Extension of Time to Get Attorney to Reply Filed by Sean Pimenta.Hearing scheduled for 11/8/2016 at 02:00 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (ghm) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2016 (ghm). Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2016 (ghm) |
|
Wednesday, September 21, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Thu 09/22 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/21/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Request to Enter Default Judgment
Tue 09/20 11:16 AM
Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Sean Pimenta filed by Bruce S. Etterman on behalf of Richard B. Honig. (Etterman, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Richard B. Honig | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Default Judgment for a Sum Certain | ||
Friday, September 16, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sat 09/17 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/16/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
File Default Papers
Wed 09/14 11:31 AM
Order to File Default Judgment Papers. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/13/2016. Deadline to file default judgment papers is 10/13/2016. (fed) |
|
7 | 7
order
File Default Papers
Wed 09/14 11:30 AM
Order to File Default Judgment Papers. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/13/2016. Deadline to file default judgment papers is 10/13/2016. (fed) |
|
court
Hearing Held
Thu 09/15 8:16 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: DEFAULT ENTERED; DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO BE SUBMITTED (ghm ) |
||
Sunday, August 28, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Mon 08/29 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/28/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
court
Entry of Default
Fri 08/26 10:55 AM
Entry of Default against Sean Pimenta The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney and Defendant. (fed) |
|
Tuesday, August 23, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Request to Enter Default
Tue 08/23 10:13 AM
Request to Enter Default Against Sean Pimenta filed by Bruce S. Etterman on behalf of Richard B. Honig. (Etterman, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Bruce S. Etterman, Esq. | ||
Att: 2 Entry of Default | ||
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/01 11:14 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Bruce S. Etterman on behalf of Richard B. Honig. (Etterman, Bruce) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Wed 07/06 4:40 PM
Summons Issued to Richard Honig for Service on Sean Pimenta Answer due on 8/5/2016 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/13/2016 at 02:00 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (wdr) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Attachments | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/06 11:21 AM
Adversary case 16-01568 Complaint by Richard B. Honig against Sean Pimenta. Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Etterman, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
crditcrd
Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Wed 07/06 11:29 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 16-01568 KCF] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A32357651, fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |