Honig v. S&R Capital Management
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-24874
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-24874
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Kathryn C Ferguson |
Case #: | 3:16-ap-01569 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 15, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
S&R Capital Management
2050 Marconi Drive Suite 300
Alpharetta, GA 30005 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard B. Honig
Hellring Lindeman Goldstein & Siegal LLP One Gateway Center 8th Floor
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
utility
Close Adversary Case
Thu 12/15 10:33 AM
Adversary Case (3:16-ap-1569) Closed. (ghm) |
||
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Fri 12/02 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/01/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Money Judgment
Tue 11/29 1:44 PM
Default Judgment For A Sum in Favor of Plaintiff, Richard B. Honig and Against Defendant, S&R Capital Management in The Amount of $ $50,000.00 . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/22/2016 (bwj) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Request to Enter Default Judgment
Tue 09/20 11:04 AM
Request to Enter Default Judgment Against S&R Capital Management filed by Bruce S. Etterman on behalf of Richard B. Honig. (Etterman, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Richard B. Honig | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Default Judgment for a Sum Certain | ||
Friday, September 16, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sat 09/17 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/16/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
File Default Papers
Wed 09/14 11:33 AM
Order to File Default Judgment Papers. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/13/2016. Deadline to file default judgment papers is 10/13/2016. (fed) |
|
court
Hearing Held
Thu 09/15 8:19 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: DEFAULT ENTERED; DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO BE SUBMITTED (ghm ) |
||
Thursday, September 08, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Fri 09/09 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/08/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
court
Entry of Default
Tue 09/06 3:42 PM
Entry of Default against S&R Capital Management The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney and Defendant. (fed) |
|
Tuesday, August 23, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Request to Enter Default
Tue 08/23 10:27 AM
Request to Enter Default Against S&R Capital Management filed by Bruce S. Etterman on behalf of Richard B. Honig. (Etterman, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Bruce S. Etterman, Esq. | ||
Att: 2 Entry of Default | ||
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/01 11:29 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Bruce S. Etterman on behalf of Richard B. Honig. (Etterman, Bruce) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Wed 07/06 4:42 PM
Summons Issued to Richard Honig for Service on S&R Capital Management Answer due on 8/5/2016 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/13/2016 at 02:00 PM at KCF - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (wdr) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Attachments | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/06 11:24 AM
Adversary case 16-01569 Complaint by Richard B. Honig against S&R Capital Management. Fee Amount $ 350.. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Etterman, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
crditcrd
Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Wed 07/06 11:29 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 16-01569 KCF] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A32357651, fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |