Nuance Communications, Inc. v. International Business Machines Corporation
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Eduardo C Robreno |
Referred: | Judith C Mccarthy |
Case #: | 7:16-cv-05173 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 27, 2016 3:15 AM EST |
Defendant
Internations Business Machines Corporation
|
|
Defendant
International Business Machines Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nuance Communications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 10, 2023 | ||
280 | 280
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 01/10 9:43 AM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to278 Notice of Appeal filed by Nuance Communications, Inc. USCA Case Number 21-1758 UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 1/10/2023..(nd) |
|
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Tue 01/10 9:44 AM
Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re:280 USCA Mandate,..(nd) |