USA v. Esformes et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 1:16-cr-20549 |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 25, 2021 2:24 PM EST |
Interested Party
Canoe Creek Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Joseph D. Mitchell
|
|
Interested Party
State of Florida Office of the Attorney General
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
1255 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
17475 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
220 Sierra LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
221 Park Place Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
ADME Real Estate LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Dan Bernstein
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Drew Bradylyons
|
|
Interested Party
2801 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Fair Havens Real Estate LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
GBRE Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Norman Ginsparg
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jane Moscowitz
|
|
Interested Party
Norman Moscowitz
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Elizabeth Young
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
SHELDON NEIDICH
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Gabriel Delgado
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Guillermo Delgado
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Federal Public Defender
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
La Hacienda Gardens LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
1st Equity Bank
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
ADME Investment Partners LTD
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
ALF Holdings Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Adirhu Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Almovea Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Ayintove Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Courtyard Manor Retirement Investors Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Courtyard Manor Retirement Living, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Eden Gardens LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Fair Havens Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Flamingo Park Manor LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
The Pointe Retirement Investors Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Takifhu Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Jene's Retirement Investors Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Sierra ALF Management LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Sefardik Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Rainbow Retirement Investors Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Morsey LC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Jene's Retirement Living, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Lauderhill Manor LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Lake Erswin LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Kabirhu Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Sherri Esformes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Odette Barcha (2)
Terminated: 04/04/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arnaldo Carmouze (3)
Terminated: 04/12/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Philip Esformes (1)
Terminated: 09/12/2019
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Florida Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program (LTCOP)
Terminated: 02/08/2021
|
Represented By
|
1. | Man Who Bribed Son Into Penn Found Guilty in $1.3 Billion Health Fraud (bloomberg.com) |
Submitted Sat 04/06/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 06/22/2024 10:03 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 21, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |