Original Case: 1:16-cr-20549

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-crim-13838
Typecriminal / direct criminal
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Nov 12, 2022 10:55 AM EST
FORMER LEGAL OFFICIALS
Represented By
Scott A. Keller
Baker Botts, LLP
contact info
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CRIMINAL DEFENSE LAWYERS
Represented By
Ryan Christopher Locke
Locke Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
PHILIP ESFORMES
Represented By
Laurie Webb Daniel
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Kim M. Watterson
Reed Smith, LLP
contact info
Howard M. Srebnick
Black Srebnick Kornspan & Stumpf, PA
contact info
Nicholas Boyd
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
James Christopher Martin
Reed Smith, LLP
contact info
Roy Black
Black Srebnick Kornspan & Stumpf, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida
U.S. Attorney Service - SFL
contact info
Emily M. Smachetti
U.S. Attorney Service - SFL
contact info
Jeremy Raymond Sanders
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Paul T. Crane
U.S. Department of Justice
contact info

GPO Jan 06 2023
Opinion issued by court as to Appellant Philip Esformes in 19-13838, 19-14874. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions. [19-13838, 19-14874]

Docket last updated: 11/12/2022 10:55 AM EST
Friday, September 27, 2019
CRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Philip Esformes on 09/26/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties
Att: 2 1 pgs Criminal Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 7 pgs District Court Judgment, DE # 1387