Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-13575

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas B Donovan
Case #: 2:16-ap-01337
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2016
Terminated:Dec 04, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lucy Gao
Represented By
Lucy Gao
contact info
Defendant
Benjamin Kirk
Represented By
Benjamin Kirk
contact info
Plaintiff
LIBERTY ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, OFFICIAL UNSECURED CREDITORS COMMITTEE FOR
Represented By
Jeremy V Richards
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Gail S Greenwood
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

GPO Dec 29 2017
Memorandum Of Decision Finding That Plaintiff Is Entitled To Judgment Against Defendants In The Amount Of $74,140,695.29. The Court finds that Ms. Gao and Mr. Kirk are jointly and severally liable to Liberty in the amount of $74,140,695.29 for breaching their fiduciary duties to Liberty and for failing to account for the funds entrusted to Liberty. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 0) Signed on 12/29/2017 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)

Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
225 225 court Close Adversary Case Wed 12/04 5:47 PM
Adversary Case 2:16-ap-1337 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff LIBERTY ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, Hearing (Adv Motion) Continued,68 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A) filed by Cross Defendant Lucy Gao, Defendant Lucy Gao,86 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF),89 Transcript,127 Transcript,145 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A) filed by Cross Defendant Lucy Gao, Defendant Lucy Gao,146 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A) filed by Cross-Claimant Benjamin Kirk, Defendant Benjamin Kirk,170 Application (Generic) filed by Plaintiff Bradley D. Sharp, 176 Hearing (Adv Motion) Set,216 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)