Adversary
|
8:13-ap-00436 - Florida Department of Financial Services as Receiv v. American Managed Care, LLC et al
|
05/20/2013
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00065 - Kapila v. Cobia Consulting, Inc.
|
01/27/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00068 - Kapila v. Integrated Graphic Solutions International LLC
|
01/27/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00091 - Kapila v. Health Management Systems, Inc.
|
01/29/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00094 - Kapila v. Dataclarity Corporation
|
01/29/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00096 - Kapila v. Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
|
01/29/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00092 - Kapila v. Five9, Inc.
|
01/29/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00090 - Kapila v. Medhok Healthcare Solutions, LLC
|
01/29/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00089 - Kapila v. Nice Systems, Inc.
|
01/29/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00088 - Kapila v. Smoothielita's, Inc. d/b/a Suncoast Coffee Se
|
01/29/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00093 - Kapila v. Devlin Consulting, Inc.
|
01/29/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00129 - Kapila v. VAR Resources LLC, successor in interest by merger
|
01/30/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00128 - Kapila v. TW Telecom Holdings, LLC f/k/a TW Telecom Holdings
|
01/30/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00099 - Kapila v. Gregory E. Matton, P.A. et al
|
01/30/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00101 - Kapila v. Nicholas & Bell, P.A. et al
|
01/30/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00097 - Kapila v. Southern Strategy Group, Inc.
|
01/30/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00130 - Kapila v. C & D Printing, Inc.
|
02/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00134 - Kapila v. ONeil Data Systems, Inc. a/k/a ONeil DS, LLC a/k/a
|
02/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00136 - Kapila v. Kelly & McKee, P.A.
|
02/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00135 - Kapila v. Colodny Fass, P.A. f/k/a Colodny, Fass, Talenfeld,
|
02/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00137 - Kapila v. Hamway
|
02/03/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00141 - Kapila v. GreatAmerica Financial Services Corporation a/k/a
|
02/03/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00158 - American Managed Care, LLC v. American Enterprise Institute et al
|
02/05/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00157 - American Managed Care, LLC v. American Association of Physicians of Indian Origi
|
02/05/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00164 - American Managed Care, LLC v. American Conservative Union Foundation
|
02/05/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00169 - American Managed Care, LLC v. Hindu Religious Center Inc., doing business as Ind
|
02/05/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00159 - American Managed Care, LLC v. DEA Educational Foundation
|
02/05/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00171 - American Managed Care, LLC v. Sunshine State Freedom Fund
|
02/05/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00165 - American Managed Care, LLC v. American Crossroads
|
02/05/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00166 - American Managed Care, LLC v. Florida Freedom Council
|
02/05/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00170 - American Managed Care, LLC v. Republican Governors Association et al
|
02/05/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00162 - American Managed Care, LLC v. The Florida Council of 100, Inc
|
02/05/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00160 - American Managed Care, LLC v. Florida Democratic Party
|
02/05/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00168 - American Managed Care, LLC v. Hindu American Foundation, Inc.
|
02/05/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-00424 - Soneet R. Kapila as Chapter 11 Trustee for estate v. McTempo Investments, Inc. d/b/a C & D Printing Com
|
05/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:16-ap-00082 - Kapila v. Republican Party of Florida
|
01/29/2016
|