Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:12-bk-12690
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2012
Creditor Meeting:Nov 05, 2012
Claims Deadline:Nov 28, 2012
Terminated:Apr 25, 2017
Plan Confirmed:Mar 18, 2013

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Southern Air Holdings, Inc.
117 Glover Ave
Norwalk, CT 06850-1311
Represented By
M. Blake Cleary
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Debtor
Southern Air Holdings, Inc., et al.
117 Glover Ave
Norwalk, CT 06850-1311
Represented By
Candace Arthur
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Jaime Luton Chapman
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Gabriel Morgan
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Maris J. Kandestin
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
M. Blake Cleary
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Brian S. Rosen
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
www.kccllc.com 2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Albert Kass
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
James E. O'Neill
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Kenneth A. Rosen
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Tatiana Ingman
Lowenstein Sandler PC
contact info
Samuel Jason Teele
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Bradford J. Sandler
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Shirley Dai
Lowenstein Sandler PC
contact info
Sharon L. Levine
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Jane M. Leamy
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Jane M. Leamy
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Friday, January 28, 2022
1271 1271 claims Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135 Fri 01/28 9:17 PM
Records Transmittal & Receipt - SF135. Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-]