Member Case
Lead case is: 1:12-bk-12690

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:12-bk-12706
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2012
Terminated:May 16, 2013

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Aircraft 21380, LLC
117 Glover Ave
Norwalk, CT 06850-1311
Represented By
M. Blake Cleary
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 09/28/2012 8:40 PM EDT
Friday, September 28, 2012
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case. (LA)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1046. Filed by Aircraft 21380, LLC. (Cleary, M. Blake)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-12706 [misc,volp11a] (1046.00). Receipt Number 6186711, amount $1046.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
3 3 Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases.An Order Has Been Entered In This Case Directing the Procedural Consolidation and Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases of Southern Air Holdings, Inc., Cargo 360, inc., Southern Air Inc., Air Mobility Inc., 21110 LLC, 21111 LLC, 21221 LLC, 21550 LLC, 21576 LLC, 21590 LLC, 21787 LLC, 21832 LLC, 23138 LLC, 24067 LLC, 46914 LLC, Aircraft 21255, LLC Aircraft 21380, LLC, and CF-50, LLC. The Docket in Case No. 12-12690 (CSS) Should Be Consulted For All Matter Affecting This Case. Signed on 9/28/2012. (JDH)
Related: [-]