|
GPO
Oct 16 2013
ORDER ; Defendant Image Media Advertising, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)21 is denied. Defendant Village of Bellwood's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) 24 is also denied. The stay on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 29 is lifted. Defendants' responses are due on or before November 1, 2013. Discovery shall move apace. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 10/16/2013. Mailed notice(ea, )
|
|
GPO
May 28 2015
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 5/28/2015:Mailed notice(jms, )
|
|
GPO
Jun 02 2015
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 6/2/2015:Mailed notice(jms, )
|
|
GPO
Jun 10 2015
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 6/10/2015:Mailed notice(jms, )
|
|
GPO
Sep 10 2015
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The Court overrules plaintiff's objections 183, 185 to Magistrate Judge Cole's May 28, 2015 memorandum opinion and order and June 2, 2015 memorandum opinion and order and overrules in part and sustains in part plaintiff's objection 188 to the June 10, 2015 memorandum opinion and order. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/10/2015 Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
|
GPO
Nov 10 2015
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 11/10/2015:Mailed notice(jms, )
|
|
GPO
Feb 14 2017
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The motions of Image Media Advertising, Inc. and the Village of Bellwood for summary judgment 217 and 220 are granted as to Counts I through V, and summary judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiff Paramount Media Group, Inc. on those claims. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's remaining state-law claims in Counts VI and VII and dismisses those claims without prejudice to plaintiff's ability to pursue them in state court. Plaintiff's motion to strike evidence presented in Image Media's reply 242is denied. Plaintiff's motion to strike Bellwood's reply to Paramount's response to Bellwood's statement of facts 244 is granted. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/14/2017. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|