Spencer Franchise Services of Georgia, Inc. v. WOW Cafe and Wingery Franchising Account, LLC
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Carl Barbier |
Referred: | Joseph C Wilkinson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:13-cv-04688 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2013 |
Re-opened: | Sep 29, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 04, 2015 5:02 AM CST |
Defendant
WOW Cafe and Wingery Franchising Account, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Spencer Franchise Services of Georgia, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Counter Claimant
WOW Cafe and Wingery Franchising Account, LLC
Terminated: 07/09/2014
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Spencer Franchise Services of Georgia, Inc.
Terminated: 07/09/2014
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/03/2016 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, May 31, 2013 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against WOW Cafe and Wingery Franchising Account, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-3999011) filed by Spencer Franchise Services of Georgia, Inc.(Butler, Peter) (Attachments 1, 2, 3 and 4 replaced on 6/4/2013) (gec, ). Modified on 6/4/2013 (gec, ). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Request of Summons Issued as to WOW Cafe and Wingery Franchising Account, LLC filed by Spencer Franchise Services of Georgia, Inc. re1 Complaint,. (Butler, Peter) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/4/2013) (gec, ). |