Spencer Franchise Svc of GA v. WOW Cafe & Wingery Franchising
Original Case: 2:13-cv-04688
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:14-pcd-31024 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2014 |
Terminated: | Sep 03, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2016 4:17 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
WOW CAFE AND WINGERY FRANCHISING ACCOUNT, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SPENCER FRANCHISE SERVICES OF GEORGIA, INCORPORATED
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 03 2015
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [14-31024 Vacated and Remanded] Judge: EGJ , Judge: PEH , Judge: WED Mandate pull date is 09/24/2015 [14-31024] |
Docket last updated: 01/09/2016 4:17 AM CST |
Friday, August 29, 2014 | ||
PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Spencer Franchise Services of Georgia, Incorporated 14-31024 (AJV) |