Maryland District Court
Judge:Catherine C Blake
Case #: 8:13-cv-01597
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause15:1640 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2013
Terminated:Nov 09, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Jan 04, 2015 3:41 AM EST
Defendant
Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By
George S Mahaffey, Jr
Goodell Devries Leech And Dann LLP
contact info
Christopher M Corchiarino
Goodell Devries Leech And Dann LLP
contact info
Defendant
Salomon Brothers Mortgage Securties VII, Inc.
Plaintiff
Angela Ayres
6600 Halleck St.
District Heights, MD 20747
Represented By
Phillip R Robinson
Consumer Law Center LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephan Ayres
6600 Halleck St
District Heights, MD 20747
Represented By
Phillip R Robinson
Consumer Law Center LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Citibank, NA
Terminated: 10/27/2014
Represented By
Christopher M Corchiarino
Goodell Devries Leech And Dann LLP
contact info
Defendant
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
Terminated: 10/27/2014
Represented By
Christopher M Corchiarino
Goodell Devries Leech And Dann LLP
contact info
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Chase Bank
Terminated: 10/27/2014
Represented By
Chad King
Simcox And Barclay LLP
contact info
Christopher M Corchiarino
Goodell Devries Leech And Dann LLP
contact info
Defendant
Litton Loan Servicing, LP
Terminated: 10/27/2014
Represented By
Christopher M Corchiarino
Goodell Devries Leech And Dann LLP
contact info
Defendant
Salomon Smith Barney Holding
Terminated: 10/27/2014
Defendant
Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.
Terminated: 10/27/2014

GPO Sep 05 2013
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 9/5/2013. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 9/5/13)
GPO Aug 27 2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 8/27/14. (c/m 8/27/14 by ca2s, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Sep 08 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 9/8/2015. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Nov 09 2016
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/9/2016. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Aug 30 2017
ORDER setting a schedule in light of the Fourth Circuit's remand of this case; directing defendants to submit a supplemental memorandum addressing the issues raised by the Fourth Circuit's order on or before 9/14/17 and plaintiffs to file a response on or before 9/28/17. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/30/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Oct 24 2017
MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/23/2017. (cags, Deputy Clerk)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.