Original Case: 8:13-cv-01597

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv.pr-02315
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2017
Terminated:May 04, 2018
Last checked: Monday May 07, 2018 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
LITTON LOAN SERVICING, LP
Defendant
SALOMON BROTHERS MORTGAGE SECURITIES VII, INC., Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Services 2001-2
Defendant
SALOMON SMITH BARNEY, INCORPORATED
Defendant
SALOMON SMITH BARNEY HOLDINGS, INCORPORATED
Defendant
CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS, INCORPORATED, formerly known as Salomon Brothers Realty Corp
Defendant
JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, INCORPORATED
Defendant
CITIBANK
Defendant - Appellee
OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Represented By
Laurie Beth Goon
DUANE MORRIS, LLP
contact info
Kelly K. Bogue
DUANE MORRIS, LLP
contact info
Brian Jeffrey Slipakoff
DUANE MORRIS, LLP
contact info
Christopher Michele Corchiarino
GOODELL DEVRIES LEECH & DANN, LLP
contact info
Alexander D. Bono
DUANE MORRIS, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Trustee for the registered holders of Salomon Brothers Mortgage Securties VII, Inc., Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Services 2001-2
Represented By
Laurie Beth Goon
DUANE MORRIS, LLP
contact info
Brian Jeffrey Slipakoff
DUANE MORRIS, LLP
contact info
Christopher Michele Corchiarino
GOODELL DEVRIES LEECH & DANN, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Trustee for the registered holders of Salomon Brothers Mortgage Securities VII, Inc., Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Services 2001-2
Represented By
Laurie Beth Goon
DUANE MORRIS, LLP
contact info
Kelly K. Bogue
DUANE MORRIS, LLP
contact info
Brian Jeffrey Slipakoff
DUANE MORRIS, LLP
contact info
Christopher Michele Corchiarino
GOODELL DEVRIES LEECH & DANN, LLP
contact info
Alexander D. Bono
DUANE MORRIS, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANGELA AYRES
Represented By
Angela Ayres
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
STEPHAN AYRES
Represented By
Stephan Ayres
contact info

GPO May 04 2018
UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 8:13-cv-01597-CCB. Copies to all parties and the district court. [1000288521]. Mailed to: Angela Ayres, Stephan Ayres and Alexander Bono. [17-2315]

Docket last updated: 05/07/2018 4:45 AM EDT
Tuesday, November 14, 2017
1 1 2 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:13-cv-01597-CCB. Case manager: CathyHerb. 17-2315 CT [Entered: 11/14/2017 09:44 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Angela Ayres and Stephan Ayres - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 12/14/2017 Originating case number: 8:13-cv-01597-CCB. Mailed to: Angela & Stephan Ayres. 17-2315 CT [Entered: 11/14/2017 09:50 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Fee notice
Att: 2 6 pgs form(s) sent
3 3 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Stephen, Angela Ayres. Informal Opening Brief due 12/08/2017 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. 17-2315 CT [Entered: 11/14/2017 09:54 AM]
Related: [-]