Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Clifton R Jessup Jr
Case #: 8:13-bk-81963
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2013
Creditor Meeting:Aug 13, 2013
Claims Deadline:Oct 29, 2013
Terminated:Jul 09, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Belle Foods, LLC
1652 Beltline Rd SW
Decatur, AL 35601-5508
Represented By
Marc P Solomon
Burr & Forman, LLP
contact info
Brent W Dorner
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Hanna Lahr
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
D Christopher Carson
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2013 3:17 AM CDT
Creditor Committee
Unsecured Creditors' Committee of Belle Foods, LLC
R. Scott Williams 2001 Park Place Suite 1400
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
David Merrill Posner
Otterbourg Steindler Houston & Rosen, PC
contact info
Jessica M Ward
Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen
contact info
Jennifer Brooke Kimble
Haskell Slaughter Young & Rediker, LLC
contact info
Gianfranco Finizio
Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen
contact info
R. Scott Williams
Haskell Slaughter Young & Rediker, LLC
contact info
Scott L Hazan
Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen
contact info
Creditor Committee
Proposed Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
David Merrill Posner
Otterbourg Steindler Houston & Rosen, PC
contact info
Creditor Committee
Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
David Merrill Posner
Otterbourg Steindler Houston & Rosen, PC
contact info

Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago
Thursday, July 11, 2019
1947 1947 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 07/12 7:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 07/11/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1946 Order on Motion
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
1946 1946 order Chapter 11 Specified Motions Tue 07/09 2:11 PM
Order Approving Motion to Relieve and Discharge GUC Trustee and Close the Bankruptcy Case of Belle Foods, LLC Related [+] Signed on 7/9/2019. (ksv)
Related: [-] 1942
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 07/09 2:19 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (ksv)
Related: [-]