Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:13-bk-81963

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Clifton R Jessup Jr
Case #: 8:15-ap-80053
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2015
Terminated:Nov 03, 2015
Last checked: never
Defendant
National Information Solutions Cooperative, Inc.
3201 Nygren Drive NW
Mandan, CO 58554
Represented By
National Information Solutions Cooperative, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter S. Kravitz
Belle Foods GUC Trustee c/o R. Scott Williams 2001 Park Place North, Ste. 1300
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
R. Scott Williams
Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, November 03, 2015
court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/03 9:34 AM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-80053 Closed (ksv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2015
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 10/16 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 10/15/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, October 13, 2015
18 18 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Tue 10/13 11:11 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Signed on 10/13/2015 Related [+]. (ksv)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Peter S. Kravitz, Defendant National Information Solutions Cooperative, Inc.
Thursday, October 08, 2015
17 17 court Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 10/08 2:07 PM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal By Peter S. Kravitz, National Information Solutions Cooperative, Inc. and Between Plaintiff and Defendant. Filed by Plaintiff Peter S. Kravitz, Defendant National Information Solutions Cooperative, Inc.. (Heard, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2015
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/02 2:40 PM
Certificate of Service for Defendants' Rule 26 Disclosures (Heard, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 19, 2015
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 09/20 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 09/19/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice and Order
Thursday, September 17, 2015
14 14 order Notice and Order Thu 09/17 2:51 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 9/17/2015. Status Conference Hearing scheduled 12/21/2015 at 03:00 PM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (ksv)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2015
13 13 court Receipt for Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 08/21 9:20 AM
Receipt number from District Court filing fee paid by Michael D. Fielding Related [+] B4601064518. (thc)
Related: [-] Item:7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Defendant National Information Solutions Cooperative, Inc.
Friday, August 14, 2015
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 08/15 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 08/14/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thursday, August 13, 2015
10 10 court Hearing Scheduled Thu 08/13 8:27 AM
Hearing Scheduled Related [+] Hearing scheduled 8/17/2015 at 03:00 PM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (dwh)
Related: [-] 9 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant National Information Solutions Cooperative, Inc.
Wednesday, August 12, 2015
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/12 2:07 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by National Information Solutions Cooperative, Inc.. (Heard, Kevin)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 08/12 12:26 PM
Order Approving Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] Signed on 8/12/2015. (dwh)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, August 10, 2015
7 7 motion Appear pro hac vice Mon 08/10 5:07 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed on behalf of Michael D. Fielding, Esq. Filed by Defendant National Information Solutions Cooperative, Inc. (Heard, Kevin)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 08/10 5:03 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kevin D. Heard Filed by Defendant National Information Solutions Cooperative, Inc.. (Heard, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2015
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 08/07 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 08/06/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Tuesday, August 04, 2015
4 4 court Notice of Hearing (Continued/Rescheduled) Tue 08/04 4:01 PM
Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled 08/17/2015 at 03:00 PM at Decatur 3rd Floor (CRJ) Decatur. (mmb)
Related: [-] Doc #1; Pretrial Conference-Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to Sections 547, 548 and 550
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 07/01 3:08 PM
Summons Service Executed on National Information Solutions Cooperative, Inc. 6/30/2015 (Williams, R.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 06/30 3:25 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/17/2015 at 01:30 PM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (dwh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/30 12:16 PM
Adversary case 15-80053 12 Related [+]) Complaint by Peter S. Kravitz against National Information Solutions Cooperative, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Williams, R.)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 06/30 12:18 PM
Receipt of Complaint 15-80053 CRJ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18180097. Fee Amount 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1