Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Gustavo A Gelpi
Referred: Bruce J Mcgiverin
Case #: 3:13-cv-01529
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2013
Re-opened:May 13, 2016
Terminated:Sep 17, 2014
Last checked: Friday Jan 02, 2015 3:38 PM AST
Defendant
Howard Delgado
Defendant
Insurance Companies A-Z
Defendant
Hector Orozco
Represented By
Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Departamento De Justicia
contact info
Defendant
Hector Pesquera
Represented By
Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Departamento De Justicia
contact info
Defendant
Police Officers A-Z
Defendant
Jose R. Roman-Abreu
Represented By
Hector J. Ferrer-Rios
Hfr Legal Services LLC
contact info
Defendant
Carlos Rosa
Represented By
Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Departamento De Justicia
contact info
Defendant
Luis Sanchez-Betances
Puerto Rico Deptarment of Justice Calle Olimpo, Esq. Axtmayer Miramar
San Juan, PR 00907
Represented By
Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Departamento De Justicia
contact info
Defendant
Guillermo Somoza-Colombani
Represented By
Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero
Departamento De Justicia
contact info
Plaintiff
Ivelissa Baez-Hernandez
Represented By
Javier A. Morales-Ramos
Javier A. Morales Ramos Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Raul Alberto Guadalupe-Baez
Represented By
Javier A. Morales-Ramos
Javier A. Morales Ramos Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Antonia Hernandez-Alejandro
Represented By
Javier A. Morales-Ramos
Javier A. Morales Ramos Law Office
contact info

GPO Sep 17 2014
OPINION AND ORDER: Granting 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (MET)
GPO Aug 28 2017
OPINION AND ORDER: Denying 64 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/28/2017. (MET)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.