Original Case: 3:13-cv-01529

First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-civil-02117
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2017
Terminated:Feb 07, 2018
Last checked: Thursday Feb 08, 2018 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
POLICE OFFICERS A-Z
Defendant
JOSE R. ROMAN-ABREU
Represented By
Hector J. Ferrer-Rios
contact info
Defendant
HOWARD DELGADO
Defendant
HECTOR OROZCO
Represented By
Idza Diaz-Rivera
PR Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant
CARLOS ROSA
Represented By
Idza Diaz-Rivera
PR Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant
GUILLERMO SOMOZA
Represented By
Idza Diaz-Rivera
PR Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant
LUIS SANCHEZ BETANCES
Represented By
Idza Diaz-Rivera
PR Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant
GUILLERMO SOMOZA-COLOMBANI
Represented By
Idza Diaz-Rivera
PR Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
HECTOR PESQUERA
Represented By
Luis Jeronimo Lopez-Valdes
PR Department of Justice
contact info
Idza Diaz-Rivera
PR Department of Justice
contact info
Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner
PR Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RAUL ALBERTO GUADALUPE-BAEZ
Represented By
Javier A. Morales-Ramos
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
IVELISSA BAEZ-HERNANDEZ
Represented By
Javier A. Morales-Ramos
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ANTONIA HERNANDEZ-ALEJANDRO
Represented By
Javier A. Morales-Ramos
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/08/2018 3:31 AM EST
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #85) filed by Appellant Hector Pesquera. Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 12/06/2017. Fee due 12/06/2017. 17-2117 (GRC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 21 pgs Abbreviated Record
Att: 2 5 pgs Case Opening Notice
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF