Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Marian F Harrison
Case #: 3:13-bk-06558
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2013
Creditor Meeting:Oct 15, 2014
Claims Deadline:Dec 14, 2014
Converted:Aug 12, 2014
Terminated:Nov 17, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
TRX SOFTWARE DEVELOPMENT, INC.
PO Box 10935
Murfreesboro, TN 37129-0019
Represented By
STEVEN L. LEFKOVITZ
Law Offices Lefkovitz & Lefkovitz
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
EVA MARIE LEMEH
4300 KINGS LANE
NASHVILLE, TN 37218
Represented By
PHILLIP G YOUNG
Thompson Burton PLLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE 701 BROADWAY STE 318
NASHVILLE, TN 37203
Represented By
CHARLES M WALKER
Office Of Us Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/25/2015 6:53 PM CDT
Monday, July 29, 2013
1 1 36 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount is $1213.00 . (LEFKOVITZ, STEVEN)
Related: [-]