Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:13-bk-06558

Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Marian F Harrison
Case #: 3:20-ap-90139
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2020
Terminated:Apr 19, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
X-PLATFORM EXPERTS RAK FREE TRADE ZONE
Represented By
X-PLATFORM EXPERTS RAK FREE TRADE ZONE
contact info
Defendant
EVA M LEMEH
Represented By
EVA M LEMEH
contact info
Defendant
ATLAS FINANCIAL SERVICES
Represented By
ATLAS FINANCIAL SERVICES
contact info
Defendant
RIVER CITY BANK
Represented By
RIVER CITY BANK
contact info
Defendant
SANTA BARBARA TAX PRODUCTS GROUP
Represented By
SANTA BARBARA TAX PRODUCTS GROUP
contact info
Defendant
STEPHEN J ZRALEK
Represented By
STEPHEN J ZRALEK
contact info
Defendant
BRYAN PIEPER
Represented By
BRYAN PIEPER
contact info
Defendant
STEVEN LEFKOVITZ
Represented By
STEVEN LEFKOVITZ
contact info
Defendant
DAVID HARRIS
Represented By
DAVID HARRIS
contact info
Defendant
JAMES FREEMAN
Represented By
JAMES FREEMAN
contact info
Defendant
ROGER ZIEMS
Represented By
ROGER ZIEMS
contact info
Defendant
TERRELL DUSTIN HUGHES
Represented By
TERRELL DUSTIN HUGHES
contact info
Defendant
TAX EXACT SALES LLC
Represented By
TAX EXACT SALES LLC
contact info
Defendant
1040 LYNC LLC
Represented By
1040 LYNC LLC
contact info
Defendant
TAX LYNC LLC
Represented By
TAX LYNC LLC
contact info
Defendant
OVER THE TOP TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
OVER THE TOP TECHNOLOGIES LLC
contact info
Defendant
TRX SOFTWARE DEVELOPMENT, INC.
Represented By
TRX SOFTWARE DEVELOPMENT, INC.
contact info
Defendant
DOUG HUGHES
Represented By
DOUG HUGHES
contact info
Plaintiff
ACTAX SOLUTIONS INC.
Represented By
ACTAX SOLUTIONS INC.
contact info
Plaintiff
VIJAY PATEL
Represented By
VIJAY PATEL
contact info
Plaintiff
KRISHNA PATEL
Represented By
KRISHNA PATEL
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Thursday, September 15, 2022
149 149 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 09/15 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 09/15/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 148 Order District Court re: Appeal - SA Order
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
148 148 order District Court re: Appeal - SA Order Tue 09/13 11:13 AM
Order By District Court Judge Trauger, Re: Appeal on Civil Action Number: 21-cv-00436, Order by Bankruptcy Court is Affirmed, Appeal Dismissed with Prejudice . Related [+]. Signed on 9/13/2022. (jjk)
Related: [-] Related Doc#:128 , 132 ,146 ,147