Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:James F Holderman
Case #: 1:13-cv-05687
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2013
Terminated:Dec 13, 2013
Last checked: Thursday Jan 01, 2015 5:54 AM CST
Defendant
City Of Chicago
Represented By
Jennifer Anne Naber
Laner Muchin, Ltd.
contact info
David Justin Seery
City Of Chicago, Law Department
contact info
Joseph Michael Gagliardo
Laner Muchin, Ltd.
contact info
Stephen Ray Patton
City Of Chicago
contact info
James J. Convery
Laner Muchin, Ltd.
contact info
Lionel W. Weaver
Richard J. Prendergast, Ltd.
contact info
Michael Thomas Layden
Richard J. Prendergast, Ltd.
contact info
Heather R.M. Becker
Laner Muchin , Ltd.
contact info
Richard J. Prendergast
Richard J. Prendergast, Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Trustees of the Policemen's Annutiy and Benefit Fund of Chicago
Defendant
Trustees of the Municipal Employees' Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago
Defendant
Trustees of the Laborers' & Retirement Board Employees' Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago
Defendant
Trustees of the Firemen's Annutiy and Benefit Fund of Chicago
Plaintiff
James M Sandow
Represented By
Clinton A. Krislov
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Kenneth Todd Goldstein
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph M Vuich
Represented By
Clinton A. Krislov
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Kenneth Todd Goldstein
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael C Underwood
Represented By
Clinton A. Krislov
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Kenneth Todd Goldstein
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
William J Selke
Represented By
Clinton A. Krislov
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Kenneth Todd Goldstein
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Raymond Scacchitti
Represented By
Clinton A. Krislov
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Kenneth Todd Goldstein
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Catherine A Sandow
Represented By
Clinton A. Krislov
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Kenneth Todd Goldstein
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis Mushol
Represented By
Clinton A. Krislov
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Kenneth Todd Goldstein
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert McNulty
Represented By
Clinton A. Krislov
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Kenneth Todd Goldstein
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Marie Johnston
Represented By
Clinton A. Krislov
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Kenneth Todd Goldstein
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
John E Dorn
Represented By
Clinton A. Krislov
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Kenneth Todd Goldstein
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Janiece R Archer
Represented By
Clinton A. Krislov
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Kenneth Todd Goldstein
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Aguinaga
Represented By
Clinton A. Krislov
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Kenneth Todd Goldstein
Krislov & Associates, Ltd.
contact info

GPO Dec 13 2013
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. For the reasons explained in the Memorandum Opinion and Order, the City's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 28) is granted as to each of the five purported claims alleged in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 55). Plaintiffs' allegations against the Pension Funds are also dismissed in their entirety. The court in making this determination sympathizes with Plaintiffs' concerns, and appreciates that retirees inevitably need health care. The court after carefully considering the matter has, however, determined that the law does not support Plaintiffs' arguments against the City's announced actions. Therefore, Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. This is a final appealable order terminating this case in favor of the City, and in favor of the other named defendants, with costs to be awarded under 28 U.S.C. § 1920.Civil Case Terminated. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 12/13/2013:Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.