Original Case: 1:13-cv-05687

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:13-cv-03790
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2013
Terminated:Feb 25, 2015
Last checked: Friday Sep 04, 2015 1:52 PM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By
Richard J. Prendergast
RICHARD J. PRENDERGAST, LTD.
contact info
Michael T. Layden
RICHARD J. PRENDERGAST, LTD.
contact info
Jennifer A. Naber
LANER MUCHIN, LTD.
contact info
James J. Convery
LANER MUCHIN, LTD.
contact info
Sara K. Hornstra
CITY OF CHICAGO LAW DEPARTMENT
contact info
Joseph Michael Gagliardo
LANER MUCHIN, LTD.
contact info
Benna Ruth Solomon
CITY OF CHICAGO LAW DEPARTMENT
contact info
Lionel W. Weaver
RICHARD J. PRENDERGAST, LTD.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL W. UNDERWOOD
Represented By
Clinton A. Krislov
KRISLOV & ASSOCIATES
contact info
Kenneth T. Goldstein
Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSEPH M. VUICH
Represented By
Clinton A. Krislov
KRISLOV & ASSOCIATES
contact info
Kenneth T. Goldstein
Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
RAYMOND SCACCHITTI
Represented By
Clinton A. Krislov
KRISLOV & ASSOCIATES
contact info
Kenneth T. Goldstein
Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ROBERT MCNULTY
Represented By
Clinton A. Krislov
KRISLOV & ASSOCIATES
contact info
Kenneth T. Goldstein
Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHN E. DORN
Represented By
Kenneth T. Goldstein
Attorney
contact info

GPO Feb 25 2015
Filed opinion of the court by Judge Easterbrook. The judgment of the district court is VACATED, and the case is REMANDED with instructions to remand the state-law claims to state court under ??1367(c). Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge; Diane S. Sykes, Circuit Judge and David F. Hamilton, Circuit Judge. [6643821-1] [6643821] [13-3790]

Docket last updated: 09/04/2015 1:38 PM CDT
Monday, December 16, 2013
THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLANTS: William J. Selke, Janiece R. Archer, Dennis Mushol, Richard Aguinaga, James M. Sandow, Catherine A. Sandow, Marie Johnston and 320 other Named Plaintiffs. [6538569-2] [6538569] 13-3790 (AD)
Related: [-]
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 12/30/2013. Appellant's brief due on or before 01/27/2014 for John E. Dorn, Robert McNulty, Raymond Scacchitti, Michael W. Underwood and Joseph M. Vuich. Record on Appeal from Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division due by 01/06/2014. [1] [6538567] 13-3790 (AD)
Related: [-]