Original Case: 1:11-cv-00691

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:14-cv-00832
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2014
Terminated:Aug 08, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 10, 2016 7:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Pablo Fajardo Mendoza
Defendant
Luis Yanza
Defendant
Frente de Defensa De La Amazonia, AKA Amazon Defense Front
Defendant
Selva Viva Selviva CIA, Ltda
Defendant
Maria Aguinda Salazar
Defendant
Carlos Grefa Huatatoca
Defendant
Catalina Antonia Aguinda Salazar
Defendant
Lidia Alexandra Aguin Aguinda
Defendant
Patricio Alberto Chimbo Yumbo
Defendant
Clide Ramiro Aguinda Aguinda
Defendant
Luis Armando Chimbo Yumbo
Defendant
Beatriz Mercedes Grefa Tanguila
Defendant
Lucio Enrique Grefa Tanguila
Defendant
Patricio Wilson Aguinda Aguinda
Defendant
Celia Irene Viveros Cusangua
Defendant
Francisco Matias Alvarado Yumbo
Defendant
Francisco Alvarado Yumbo
Defendant
Olga Gloria Grefa Cerda
Defendant
Lorenzo Jose Alvarado Yumbo
Defendant
Narcisa Aida Tanguila Narvaez
Defendant
Bertha Antonia Yumbo Tanguila
Defendant
Gloria Lucrecia Tangui Grefa
Defendant
Franciso Victor Tranguil Grefa
Defendant
Rosa Teresa Chimbo Tanguila
Defendant
Jose Gabriel Revelo Llore
Defendant
Maria Clelia Reascos Revelo
Defendant
Maria Magdalena Rodri Barcenes
Defendant
Jose Miguel Ipiales Chicaiza
Defendant
Heleodoro Pataron Guaraca
Defendant
Luisa Delia Tanguila Narvaez
Defendant
Lourdes Beatriz Chimbo Tanguil
Defendant
Maria Hortencia Viver Cusangua
Defendant
Segundo Angel Amanta Milan
Defendant
Octavio Ismael Cordova Huanca
Defendant
Elia Roberto Piyahua Payahuaje
Defendant
Daniel Carlos Lusitand Yaiguaje
Defendant
Benancio Fredy Chimbo Grefa
Defendant
Guillermo Vicente Payagua Lusitante
Defendant
Delfin Leonidas Payagu Payaguaje
Defendant
Alfredo Donaldo Payagua Payaguaje
Defendant
Miguel Mario Payaguaje Payaguaje
Defendant
Teodoro Gonzalo Piaguaj Payaguaje
Defendant
Fermin Piaguaje Payaguaje
Defendant
Reinaldo Lusitande Yaiguaje
Defendant
Luis Agustin Payagua Piaguaje
Defendant
Emilio Martin Lusitand Yaiguaje
Defendant
Simon Lusitande Yaiguaje
Defendant
Armando Wilfrido Piagua Payaguaje
Defendant
Angel Justino Piaguag Lucitant
Defendant
Kemperi Baihua Huani
Defendant
Ahua Baihua Caiga
Defendant
Pentibo Baihua Miipo
Defendant
Dabota Tega Huani
Defendant
Ahuame Huani Baihua
Defendant
Apara Quemperi Yate
Defendant
Bai Baihua Miipo
Defendant
Bebanca Tega Huani
Defendant
Comita Huani Yate
Defendant
Cope Tega Huani
Defendant
Ehuenguinto Tega
Defendant
Gaware Tega Huani
Defendant
Martin Baihua Miipo
Defendant
Mencay Baihua Tega
Defendant
Menemo Huani Baihua
Defendant
Miipo Yatehue Kemperi
Defendant
Minihua Huani Yate
Defendant
Nama Baihua Huani
Defendant
Namo Huani Yate
Defendant
Omari Apica Huani
Defendant
Omene Baihua Huani
Defendant
Yehua Tega Huani
Defendant
Wagui Coba Huani
Defendant
Weica Apica Huani
Defendant
Tepaa Quimontari Waiwa
Defendant
Nenquimo Venancio Nihua
Defendant
Compa Guiquita
Defendant
Conta Nenquimo Quimontari
Defendant
Daniel Ehuengei
Defendant
Nantoqui Nenquimo
Defendant
Okata Quipa Nihua
Defendant
Cai Baihua Quemperi
Defendant
Omayihue Baihua
Defendant
Tapare Ahua Yete
Defendant
Teweyene Luciana Nam Tega
Defendant
Abamo Omene
Defendant
Onenca Enomenga
Defendant
Pego Enomenga
Defendant
Wane Ima
Defendant
Wina Enomenga
Defendant
Cahuiya Omaca
Defendant
Mima Yeti
Defendant - Appellant
Javier Piaguaje Payaguaje
Represented By
Burt Neuborne
New York University School of Law
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Hugo Gerardo Camacho Naranjo
Defendant-Counter-Claimant
Stratus Consulting, Inc.
Defendant-Counter-Claimant
Douglas Beltman
Defendant-Counter-Claimant
Ann Maest
Defendant-Counter-Claimant
Steven Donziger
Represented By
Richard Henry Friedman
Friedman Rubin
contact info
Defendant-Counter-Claimant
The Law Offices of Steven R. Donziger
Represented By
Richard Henry Friedman
Friedman Rubin
contact info
Defendant-Counter-Claimant
Donziger & Associates, PLLC
Represented By
Richard Henry Friedman
Friedman Rubin
contact info
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellee
Chevron Corporation
Represented By
Theodore B. Olson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Andrea Ellen Neuman
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
William Edward Thomson III
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Randy Michael Mastro
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Respondent
Andrew Woods
Respondent
Laura J. Garr
Respondent
H5

GPO Aug 08 2016
OPINION, the district court judgment is affirmed, by ALK, BDP, RCW, FILED.[1834987] [14-826, 14-832]

Docket last updated: 05/17/2021 12:13 AM EDT
Friday, March 21, 2014
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Hugo Gerardo Camacho Naranjo and Javier Piaguaje Payaguaje, FILED. [1184796] [14-832] [Entered: 03/24/2014 09:59 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 03/04/2014, RECEIVED.[1184806] [14-832] [Entered: 03/24/2014 10:02 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/04/2014, RECEIVED.[1184808] [14-832] [Entered: 03/24/2014 10:03 AM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1184811] [14-832] [Entered: 03/24/2014 10:03 AM]
Related: [-]