New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis A Kaplan
Referred: Robert W Lehrburger
Case #: 1:11-cv-00691
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2011
Terminated:Mar 04, 2014
Last checked: Sunday Mar 15, 2015 5:21 PM EDT
Defendant
Clide Ramiro Aguinda Aguinda
Defendant
Lidia Alexandra Aguinda Aguinda
Defendant
Patricio Wilson Aguinda Aguinda
Defendant
Francisco Matias Alvarado Yumbo
Defendant
Lorenzo Jose Alvarado Yumbo
Defendant
Segundo Angel Amanta Milan
Defendant
Benancio Fredy Chimbo Grefa
Defendant
Lourdes Beatriz Chimbo Tanguil
Defendant
Rosa Teresa Chimbo Tanguila
Defendant
Luis Armando Chimbo Yumbo
Defendant
Octavio Ismael Cordova Huanca
Defendant
Frente de Defensa De La Amazonia
Defendant
Olga Gloria Grefa Cerda
Defendant
Beatriz Mercedes Grefa Tanguila
Defendant
Lucio Enrique Grefa Tanguila
Defendant
Heleodoro Pataron Guaraca
Defendant
Carlos Grefa Huatatoca
Defendant
Jose Miguel Ipiales Chicaiza
Defendant
Daniel Carlos Lusitande Yaiguaje
Defendant
Emilio Martin Lusitande Yaiguaje
Defendant
Reinaldo Lusitande Yaiguaje
Defendant
Pablo Fajardo Mendoza
Defendant
Guillermo Vicente Payaguaje Lusitante
Defendant
Alfredo Donaldo Payaguaje Payaguaje
Defendant
Delfin Leonidas Payaguaje Payaguaje
Defendant
Miguel Mario Payaguaje Payaguaje
Defendant
Luis Agustin Payaguaje Piaguaje
Defendant
Angel Justino Piaguage Lucitant
Defendant
Teodoro Gonzalo Piaguaje Payaguaje
Defendant
Armando Wilfrido Piaguaje Payaguaje
Defendant
Fermin Piaguaje Payaguaje
Defendant
Elias Roberto Piyahuaje Payahuaje
Defendant
Maria Clelia Reascos Revelo
Defendant
Jose Gabriel Revelo Llore
Defendant
Maria Magdalena Rodriguez Barcenes
Defendant
Catalina Antonia Aguinda Salazar
Defendant
Maria Aguinda Salazar
Defendant
Selva Viva Selviva CIA, Ltda
Defendant
Bertha Antonia Yumbo Tanguila
Defendant
Gloria Lucrecia Tanguila Grefa
Defendant
Luisa Delia Tanguila Narvaez
Defendant
Narcisa Aida Tanguila Narvaez
Defendant
Franciso Victor Tanguilla Grefa
Defendant
Celia Irene Viveros Cusangua
Defendant
Maria Hortencia Viveros Cusangua
Defendant
Simon Lusitande Yaiguaje
Defendant
Luis Yanza
Defendant
Francisco Alvarado Yumbo
Defendant
Patricio Alberto Chimbo Yumbo
Interested Party
Joseph C. Kohn
Represented By
Joshua J. Voss
Conrad O'Brien PC
contact info
James J. Rohn
Conrad O'Brien PC
contact info
Seth D. Ard
Susman Godfrey Llp (nyc)
contact info
Patricia Mary Hamill
Conrad O'Brien PC
contact info
Stephen D. Susman
Susman Godfrey Llp (tx)
contact info
Interested Party
Kohn Swift & Graf, P.C.
Represented By
Joshua J. Voss
Conrad O'Brien PC
contact info
James J. Rohn
Conrad O'Brien PC
contact info
Seth D. Ard
Susman Godfrey Llp (nyc)
contact info
Patricia Mary Hamill
Conrad O'Brien PC
contact info
Stephen D. Susman
Susman Godfrey Llp (tx)
contact info
Interested Party
Patton Boggs LLP
Represented By
James Kenneth Leader
Leader & Berkon LLP
contact info
Caroline Curtiss Marino
Leader & Berkon LLP
contact info
S. Alyssa Young
Leader & Berkon LLP
contact info
Thomas Key Richards
Leader & Berkon LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Republic of Ecuador
Represented By
Charles MacNeil Mitchell
Winston & Strawn Llp (ny)
contact info
Movant
Laura Belanger
Movant
John Rodgers
Plaintiff
Chevron Corporation
Represented By
Reed Michael Brodsky
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Christopher Michael Joralemon
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Anne Marie Champion
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Jefferson Eliot Bell
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Robert C. Blume
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (denver)
contact info
Randy M. Mastro
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Jeffrey David Coren
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Georgia K. Winston
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Kristen Luise Hendricks
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Jason B. Stavers
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
William Edward Thomson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Mary Beth Maloney
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Andrea Ellen Neuman
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Avi Weitzman
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Scott A Edelman
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Respondent
Laura J Garr
Respondent
H5
Represented By
Frederick Reed Kessler
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
contact info
Respondent
Andrew Woods
Special Master
Max Gitter
Special Master
Theodore H. Katz
TERMINATED PARTIES
Counter Claimant
Douglas Beltman
Terminated: 04/11/2013
Represented By
Martin Beier
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Gordon Mehler
Law Offices Of Gordon Mehler, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Benjamin H. Green
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Joe L. Silver
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Jessica R. Torbin
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Stuart Alan Krause
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Michael Erik Sims
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Steven Donziger
Terminated: 07/29/2013
Represented By
Paula Lenore Blizzard
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Justina K. Sessions
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Elliot Remsen Peters
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Nikki H. Vo
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Christopher Jacob Young
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Jan Nielsen Little
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Richard Henry Friedman
Friedman | Rubin
contact info
John W. Keker
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Matthew M. Werdegar
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
William S. Hicks
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Donziger & Associates, PLLC
Terminated: 07/29/2013
Represented By
Justina K. Sessions
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Elliot Remsen Peters
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Jan Nielsen Little
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Richard Henry Friedman
Friedman | Rubin
contact info
John W. Keker
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Ann Maest
Terminated: 04/11/2013
Represented By
Martin Beier
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Gordon Mehler
Law Offices Of Gordon Mehler, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Benjamin H. Green
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Joe L. Silver
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Jessica R. Torbin
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Stuart Alan Krause
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Michael Erik Sims
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Stratus Consulting, Inc.
Terminated: 04/08/2013
Represented By
Martin Beier
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Gordon Mehler
Law Offices Of Gordon Mehler, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Benjamin H. Green
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Joe L. Silver
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Jessica R. Torbin
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Stuart Alan Krause
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Michael Erik Sims
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
The Law Offices of Steven R. Donziger
Terminated: 07/29/2013
Represented By
Paula Lenore Blizzard
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Justina K. Sessions
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Elliot Remsen Peters
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Nikki H. Vo
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Christopher Jacob Young
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Jan Nielsen Little
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
John W. Keker
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Matthew M. Werdegar
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
William S. Hicks
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Chevron Corporation
Terminated: 07/29/2013
Represented By
Kristen Luise Hendricks
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Christopher Michael Joralemon
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Anne Marie Champion
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Randy M. Mastro
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (ny)
contact info
Jason B. Stavers
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
William Edward Thomson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Andrea Ellen Neuman
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Scott A Edelman
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Douglas Beltman
Terminated: 04/11/2013
Represented By
Martin Beier
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Gordon Mehler
Law Offices Of Gordon Mehler, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Benjamin H. Green
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Joe L. Silver
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Jessica R. Torbin
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Stuart Alan Krause
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Michael Erik Sims
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hugo Gerardo Camacho Naranjo
Terminated: 03/04/2014
Represented By
Larry R Veselka
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka, LLP
contact info
Steven Robert Donziger
Donziger & Associates
contact info
Steven J. Hyman
Mclaughlin And Stern, LLP
contact info
Garland D Murphy, IV
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka, LLP
contact info
Craig Smyser
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka, LLP
contact info
Carlos A. Zelaya, II
Mumphrey Law Firm, L.L.C
contact info
Norman H Siegel
Siegel Teitelbaum & Evans LLP
contact info
F. Gerald Maples
F. Gerald Maples, P.A.
contact info
Christina A. Bryan
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka, L.L.P.
contact info
Julio Cesar Gomez
Julio C. Gomez, Attorney At Law LLC
contact info
Sheldon Howard Elsen
Orans, Elsen & Lupert, LLP
contact info
Tyler Geoffrey Doyle
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka, LLP
contact info
Richard Henry Friedman
Friedman | Rubin
contact info
Defendant
Steven Donziger
Terminated: 03/04/2014
Represented By
Paula Lenore Blizzard
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Justina K. Sessions
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Elliot Remsen Peters
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Nikki H. Vo
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Steven Robert Donziger
Donziger & Associates
contact info
Christopher Jacob Young
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Jan Nielsen Little
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Richard Henry Friedman
Friedman | Rubin
contact info
John W. Keker
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Matthew M. Werdegar
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Zoe Littlepage
The Littlepage Firm, P.C.
contact info
William S. Hicks
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Donziger & Associates, PLLC
Terminated: 03/04/2014
Represented By
Justina K. Sessions
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Elliot Remsen Peters
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Steven Robert Donziger
Donziger & Associates
contact info
Jan Nielsen Little
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Richard Henry Friedman
Friedman | Rubin
contact info
John W. Keker
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Zoe Littlepage
The Littlepage Firm, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Ann Maest
Terminated: 04/11/2013
Represented By
Martin Beier
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Gordon Mehler
Law Offices Of Gordon Mehler, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Benjamin H. Green
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Joe L. Silver
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Jessica R. Torbin
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Stuart Alan Krause
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Michael Erik Sims
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Defendant
Javier Piaguaje Payaguaje
Terminated: 03/04/2014
Represented By
Larry R Veselka
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka, LLP
contact info
Steven Robert Donziger
Donziger & Associates
contact info
Steven J. Hyman
Mclaughlin And Stern, LLP
contact info
Garland D Murphy, IV
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka, LLP
contact info
Craig Smyser
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka, LLP
contact info
Carlos A. Zelaya, II
Mumphrey Law Firm, L.L.C
contact info
Norman H Siegel
Siegel Teitelbaum & Evans LLP
contact info
F. Gerald Maples
F. Gerald Maples, P.A.
contact info
Christina A. Bryan
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka, L.L.P.
contact info
Julio Cesar Gomez
Julio C. Gomez, Attorney At Law LLC
contact info
Sheldon Howard Elsen
Orans, Elsen & Lupert, LLP
contact info
Tyler Geoffrey Doyle
Smyser Kaplan & Veselka, LLP
contact info
Richard Henry Friedman
Friedman | Rubin
contact info
Defendant
Stratus Consulting , Inc.
Terminated: 04/08/2013
Represented By
Martin Beier
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Gordon Mehler
Law Offices Of Gordon Mehler, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Benjamin H. Green
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Joe L. Silver
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Jessica R. Torbin
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Stuart Alan Krause
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stratus Consulting, Inc.
Terminated: 04/08/2013
Represented By
Martin Beier
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Gordon Mehler
Law Offices Of Gordon Mehler, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Benjamin H. Green
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Joe L. Silver
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Jessica R. Torbin
Silver & Deboskey, A Professional Corporation
contact info
John W. Keker
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Stuart Alan Krause
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Michael Erik Sims
Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Law Offices of Steven R. Donziger
Terminated: 03/04/2014
Represented By
Paula Lenore Blizzard
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Justina K. Sessions
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Elliot Remsen Peters
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Nikki H. Vo
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Steven Robert Donziger
Donziger & Associates
contact info
Christopher Jacob Young
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Jan Nielsen Little
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Richard Henry Friedman
Friedman | Rubin
contact info
John W. Keker
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Matthew M. Werdegar
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Zoe Littlepage
The Littlepage Firm, P.C.
contact info
William S. Hicks
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Ahuame Huani Baihua
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Omayihue Baihua
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
menemo Huani Baihua
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Ahua Baihua Caiga
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Daniel Ehuengei
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Onenca Enomenga
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Pego Enomenga
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Wina Enomenga
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Compa Guiquita
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Bebanca Tega Huani
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Cope Tega Huani
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Dabota Tega Huani
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Kemperi Baihua Huani
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Nama Baihua Huani
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Omari Apica Huani
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Omene Baihua Huani
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Wagui Coba Huani
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Weica Apica Huani
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Yehua Tega Huani
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
gaware Tega Huani
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Wane Ima
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Miipo Yatehue Kemperi
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Bai Baihua Miipo
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Martin Baihua Miipo
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Pentibo Baihua Miipo
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Nantoqui Nenquimo
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Nenquimo Venancio Nihua
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Okata Quipa Nihua
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Cahuiya Omaca
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Abamo Omene
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Cai Baihua Quemperi
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Conta Nenquimo Quimontari
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Ehuenguinto Tega
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Mencay Baihua Tega
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Teweyene Luciana Nam Tega
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Tepaa Quimontari Waiwa
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Apara Quemperi Yate
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Comita Huani Yate
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Minihua Huani Yate
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Namo Huani Yate
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Tapare Ahua Yete
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Mima Yeti
Terminated: 01/14/2013
Represented By
Kathryn Lee Crawford
Schwarcz Rimberg Boyd & Rader, LLP
contact info


1. Chevron, Donziger to Face Off Over $9.5 Billion Judgment (wsj.com)
Submitted Mon 04/20/2015
2. Anatomy of a Conspiracy (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Wed 10/29/2014
3. Chevron wins favorable ruling in U.S. in fight against $9.5 billion judgment in Ecuador (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Wed 03/05/2014
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
misc Mail Order by USPS Wed 05/18 10:34 AM
Mailed a copy of2691 Memo Endorsement to Patricio Salazar Cordovavia Santa Ines E3-116 y Barbara Esparza, Conjunto Residencial Mijas, Casa 2, Cambaya, Ecuador (kh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
2691 2691 order Memo Endorsement Tue 05/17 11:18 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:2690 Letter filed by United States of America. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's bond shall be exonerated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/17/2022) (va) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
2690 2690 misc Letter Mon 05/16 5:55 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Rita M. Glavin dated 5/16/22 re: Response to Motion to Release Bond Obligation. Document filed by United States of America..(Glavin, Rita)
Related: [-]