Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-00076

Alaska Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Herbert A Ross
Case #: 3:16-ap-90016
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2016
Terminated:Jun 25, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By
Costco Wholesale Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Nacole M. Jipping(7)
PO Box 110502
Anchorage, AK 99511
Represented By
Cabot C. Christianson
Law Offices Of Cabot Christianson, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM AKDT
Sunday, June 25, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Sun 06/25 8:18 AM
Adversary Case Closed.(JS)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2017
33 33 order Judgment of Dismissal (ADV NIDS ONLY - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA) Fri 06/02 9:41 AM
Judgment of Dismissal, with prejudice.(AM)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (NIDS ONLY - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA) Fri 06/02 9:39 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding, with prejudice. Related [+].(AM)
Related: [-] DE#31 Order Re Intent to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (SA)
Wednesday, May 17, 2017
31 31 order Intent to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (SA) Wed 05/17 3:17 PM
Order Regarding Intent to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections due by 5/31/2017. (LD)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Intent to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA) Wed 05/17 1:26 PM
Order Regarding Intent to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, with prejudice.(AM) Modified on 5/17/2017 (Stafford, Janet). **DISREGARD - This image was not generated and was not noticed through the BNC. Another order will be entered.** Modified on 5/17/2017 (Stafford, Janet)
Related: [-]
utility QC Remark (generic) Wed 05/17 2:41 PM
QC Remark by Clerks Office. Disregard DE# 30 Order Re Intent to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding as the image was not generated and was not noticed through the BNC. Another order will be entered. (JS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2017
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 04/07 8:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/07/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] DE#28 Order Approving Settlement (SA)
Wednesday, April 05, 2017
28 28 order Approving Settlement (SA) Wed 04/05 4:15 PM
Order Granting Trustee's Application For Authority To Settle Jipping v. Costco Adversary Action. Related [+].(LD)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
27 27 order Reassigning Judge (SA) Tue 02/28 3:45 PM
Administrative Order Reassigning Case [from HAR to GS]. (LD)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2017
26 26 court Proceeding Memo Fri 02/24 11:34 AM
Proceeding Memo Re: TELEPHONIC CONTINUED Status Conference. See proceeding memo for specifics/ruling. No order will be submitted. Related [+]. (LD)
Related: [-] DE#23 Proceeding Memo,25 Motion to Vacate
Thursday, February 23, 2017
25 25 motion Vacate Thu 02/23 10:07 AM
Motion to Vacate Status Conference From Calendar Due to Settlement of Adversary Action . Related [+]. Filed by Cabot C. Christianson on behalf of Nacole M. Jipping(7).(Christianson, Cabot)
Related: [-] DE#20 Order to Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
Friday, January 27, 2017
24 24 audio Audio File Fri 01/27 4:15 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/25/2017 9:38:32 AM ]. File Size [ 452 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:53 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
23 23 court Proceeding Memo Thu 01/26 2:15 PM
Proceeding Memo Re: TELEPHONIC CONTINUED Status Conference. See proceeding memo for specifics. A Continued Status hearing is set for 2/23/2017 at 02:30 PM in Historic Courtroom - Anchorage, Old Fed Bldg. Related [+]. (LD)
Related: [-] DE#21 Proceeding Memo
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
22 22 audio Audio File Wed 01/18 4:15 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/12/2017 9:34:43 AM ]. File Size [ 184 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:46 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
21 21 court Proceeding Memo Fri 01/13 11:49 AM
Proceeding Memo Re: TELEPHONIC CONTINUED Status Conference. See proceeding memo for specifics/ruling. Status Conference has been rescheduled to 1/25/2017 at 09:00 AM in Historic Courtroom - Anchorage, Old Fed Bldg. Related [+]. (LD)
Related: [-] 20 Order to Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
20 20 order Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA) Thu 01/12 9:54 AM
Order Rescheduling Status Conference. Status Conference is rescheduled to 01/25/2017 at 09:00 AM in Historic Courtroom - Anchorage, Old Fed Bldg. Related [+]. (LD)
Related: [-] DE#19 Stipulation
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
19 19 misc Stipulation Wed 01/11 4:57 PM
Stipulation Between Nacole M. Jipping(7) and Costco Wholesale Corporation, Re: Reschedule Status Conference . Filed by Cabot C. Christianson on behalf of Nacole M. Jipping(7).(Christianson, Cabot)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
utility Calendar Remark (Matter Continued / Rescheduled) Thu 01/05 11:00 AM
Calendar Remark - the hearing set for Friday, January 6, 2017 at 9:15 a.m. is CONTINUED / RESCHEDULED to THURSDAY, JANUARY 12, 2017 AT 9:30 A.M. at the request of the parties. Related [+].(CR)
Related: [-] DE#17 Proceeding Memo
Tuesday, December 13, 2016
18 18 audio Audio File Tue 12/13 4:15 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/12/2016 9:01:04 AM ]. File Size [ 704 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:56 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
17 17 court Proceeding Memo Mon 12/12 10:49 AM
Proceeding Memo Re: TELEPHONIC Status Conference. See proceeding memo for specifics. Status Conference continued to 1/6/2017 at 09:15 AM in Historic Courtroom - Anchorage, Old Fed Bldg. No order will be submitted. Related [+]. (LD)
Related: [-] DE#14 Proceeding Memo
Friday, October 14, 2016
15 15 court Clerks Notice of Undeliverable Mail Fri 10/14 8:24 AM
Clerks Entry Regarding Undeliverable Mail For Jane Pearson . Mail was returned undeliverable because of a typo in the address, however the status conference was held and Ms. Pearson attended. Related [+]. (MW)
Related: [-] DE#8 Order Setting Hearing (SA)
Thursday, October 13, 2016
16 16 audio Audio File Fri 10/14 12:19 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/12/2016 8:59:40 AM ]. File Size [ 1168 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:52 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2016
14 14 court Proceeding Memo Wed 10/12 1:24 PM
Proceeding Memo Re: Scheduling and Planning Conference. See proceeding memo for specifics. Scheduling and Planning Conference continued to 12/12/2016 at 09:00 AM in Historic Courtroom - Anchorage, Old Fed Bldg. Related [+]. (MW)
Related: [-] DE#8 Order Setting Hearing (SA)
Tuesday, October 11, 2016
13 13 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 10/11 11:56 AM
Order Granting Amended Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice. Related [+](MW)
Related: [-] 11
12 12 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 10/11 11:52 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice. Related [+] (MW)
Related: [-] 10
utility QC Remark (generic) Tue 10/11 2:43 PM
QC Remark by Clerks Office. Disregard the Order entered at DE# 12 as it was entered in error. See the correct Order entered at DE# 13 Related [+].(MW)
Related: [-] DE#12 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Friday, October 07, 2016
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/07 12:33 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Jane Elizabeth Pearson on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Pearson, Jane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jane Pearson
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/07 9:44 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Steven W Block on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Block, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jane Pearson
utility QC Remark Re: Admission to Practice AK LBR 2090-1(b) Fri 10/07 10:18 AM
QC Remark by Clerks Office. The document referenced in this entry was filed by an out of district attorney for another attorney. The attorney requesting to appear pro hac vice must refer to and comply with AK LBR 2090-1(b) herself. Related [+].(DG)
Related: [-] DE#10 Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Thursday, September 29, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 09/29 9:06 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/29/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] DE#8 Order Setting Hearing (SA)
Tuesday, September 27, 2016
8 8 order Setting Hearing (SA) Tue 09/27 4:30 PM
Order Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference. Scheduling and Planning Conference is set for 10/12/2016 at 09:00 AM in Historic Courtroom - Anchorage, Old Fed Bldg. Related [+]. (MW)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint
Monday, September 19, 2016
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint (APANS01) Mon 09/19 1:58 PM
Answer to Complaint . Filed by Steven W Block on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Block, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2016
6 6 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 08/15 2:43 PM
Summons Service Executed on Costco Wholesale Corporation, defendant, on 8/15/2016. Related [+]. (Christianson, Cabot). Related document(s)4 Summons Issued. Modified on 8/16/2016 (Bennett, Maia)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint
5 5 misc Errata Mon 08/15 10:16 AM
Errata to Complaint . Related [+]. Filed by Cabot C. Christianson on behalf of Nacole M. Jipping(7).(Christianson, Cabot)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit E - back up for Check 4097
Att: 2 Exhibit H - back up for check 4151
Att: 3 Exhibit I - back up for check 3802
Tuesday, August 09, 2016
4 4 court Summons Issued Tue 08/09 3:26 PM
Copy of Summons Issued on Costco Wholesale Corporation Date Issued 8/9/2016, Answer Due 9/8/2016. (DG)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Form 1040) Tue 08/09 2:46 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet. Filed by Cabot C. Christianson on behalf of Nacole M. Jipping(7).(Christianson, Cabot)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Summons Service Unexecuted Tue 08/09 2:44 PM
Summons Unexecuted Service on Costco Wholesale Corporation, defendant. (Christianson, Cabot) Modified on 8/10/2016 (Bennett, Maia). **Note: This is not a summons unexecuted service. Filer was notified to submit summons to court for issuance.**
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Used in Open AP Case) Tue 08/09 2:38 PM
Adversary case 16-90016 Complaint by Nacole M. Jipping(7) against Costco Wholesale Corporation. Fee Amount $350. Filed by Cabot C. Christianson. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Christianson, Cabot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 3488
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 3565
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 3592
Att: 4 Exhibit D - 3707
Att: 5 Exhibit E - 4097
Att: 6 Exhibit F - 3904
Att: 7 Exhibit G - 4026
Att: 8 Exhibit H - 4151
Att: 9 Exhibit I - 4151
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 08/09 2:39 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 16-90016 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1491153. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
utility Adversary Review Completed Tue 08/09 3:03 PM
Adversary Review Completed. Related [+].(DG)
Related: [-] DE#1 Complaint