Original Case: 2:15-cv-05452

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-03420
Typecivil / united states as party / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2016
Terminated:Apr 05, 2017
Last checked: Thursday Apr 06, 2017 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
WELLS FARGO BANK
Defendant
GREG CUGINO, WCPD OFFICER
Defendant
KEITH LAURER, CHESTER COUNTY PROBATION OFFICER
Defendant
JOHN R. MERRICK, CHESTER COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER
Defendant
NATHAN SHENKER, CHESTER COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER
Defendant
BRYAN WALTERS, PROTHONOTARY
Defendant
DAILY LOCAL NEWS COURTHOUSE
Defendant
THOMAS W. CORBETT, JR., ATTORNEY GENERAL
Defendant
ATTORNEY LEONARD J RIVERA & MACELREE HARVEY LAW FIRM
Defendant
ATTORNEY DAWSON RICHARD MUTH & GOLDBERG MEANIX MCCALLIN AND MUTH LAW FIRM
Defendant
ERIC TRAJTENBERG, ATTORNEY
Defendant
DAILY LOCAL NEWSPAPER
Defendant
OPTIMA WEB DESIGN, RON SHUR, NICK POTOPOV
Defendant
L. FELIPE RESTREPO, FEDERAL COURT JUDGE
Defendant
MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG, FEDERAL COURT JUDGE
Defendant
CHARLES MAINES, CHESTER COUNTY PROBATION OFFICER
Defendant
DANIELLE CUGINO, CHESTER COUNTY PROBATION COLLECTION OFFICER
Defendant
BERNARD A. MOORE, Judge
Defendant
LUMBER LIQUIDATORS
Defendant
DELAWARE COUNTY
Defendant
DELAWARE COUNTY JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER
Defendant
MARK A. MURRAY, DIRECTOR OF DEL. COUNTY JUVENILE DETENTION
Defendant
MEDCENTER 100
Defendant
WILLIAM KRAUT, DISTRICT JUDGE
Defendant
CHESTER COUNTY HOSPITAL
Defendant
MICHAEL J. DUNCAN, CC HOSP. CEO
Defendant
MAIN LINE HEALTH CARE
Defendant
WILLIAM J. DITTER, FEDERAL JUDGE
Defendant
UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA
Defendant
EDWARD G. SMITH, FEDERAL JUDGE
Defendant
ALAN J. DAVIS, COLLECTIVELY, "CHESTER COUNTY MOLLUSCUM PENIS CRIME FAMILY"
Defendant
ROSE ANDERSON, CCDRS HEARING OFFICER
Defendant
STAN BILLIE, WCPD DETECTIVE
Defendant
CHESTER COUNTY
Defendant
CHESTER COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS
Defendant
JAMES P. MACELREE, II, President Judge
Defendant
ANTHONY A. SARCIONE, Judge
Defendant
THOMAS G. GAVIN, Judge
Defendant
JACQUELINE CODY, Judge
Defendant
KATHERINE B.L. PLATT, Judge
Defendant
MARK L. TUNNELL, Judge
Defendant
JOHN L. BRAXTON
Defendant
CHESTER COUNTY DOMESTIC RELATIONS CCDRS
Defendant
JOSEPH M. WATERS, CCDRS DIRECTOR
Defendant
WILLIAM R. WHITEHEAD, CCDRS DEPUTY DIRECTOR
Defendant
ROBIN KELLY, CCDRS DIRECTOR
Defendant
CATHY SMITH, CCDRS ADMINISTRATIVE SECRETARY
Defendant
SHAUNA JOHNSON, CCDRS ENFORCEMENT OFFICER
Defendant
RICHARD LOMBARDI, CCDRS HEARING OFFICER
Defendant
LOUIS DESCHULLO, WCPD SGT.
Defendant
SCOTT BOHN, WCPD CHIEF
Defendant
WEST CHESTER POLICE, WCPD/W.C. BOROUGH
Defendant
CHARLES GAZA, CCDA
Defendant
CRISTIN KUBACKE, CCDA
Defendant
JOSEPH A. CARROLL, FORMER DA
Defendant
PETER HOBART, CCDA
Defendant
THOMAS P. HOGAN, CHESTER COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY CCDA
Defendant
WILLIAM HANDY, CHESTER COUNTY COURT REPORTER CHIEF
Defendant
ROBERT E. KYLE, DIRECTOR OF JUVENILE PROBATION
Defendant
JANET SNYDER, FAMILY COURT SECRETARY
Defendant
ROSE ANDERSON, CCDRS HEALING OFFICER
Defendant
MARY JONES, CCDRS STAFF ATTORNEY
Defendant - Appellee
DELAWARE COUNTY JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER
Represented By
Suzanne McDonough
Holsten & Associates
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM KRAUT, DISTRICT JUDGE
Represented By
Martha Gale
Administrative Office of Pennsylvania Courts
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MARK A. MURRAY, DIRECTOR OF DEL. COUNTY JUVENILE DETENTION
Represented By
Suzanne McDonough
Holsten & Associates
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DELAWARE COUNTY
Represented By
Suzanne McDonough
Holsten & Associates
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WELLS FARGO BANK
Represented By
Steven B. Kantrowitz
Kantrowitz & Phillippi
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BERNARD A. MOORE, Judge
Represented By
Martha Gale
Administrative Office of Pennsylvania Courts
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHESTER COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS
Represented By
Martha Gale
Administrative Office of Pennsylvania Courts
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN J. LISS, WEST GOSHEN POLICE OFFICER
Represented By
John P. Morgenstern
Deasey Mahoney & Valentini
contact info
Rufus A. Jennings
Deasey Mahoney & Valentini
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WEST GOSHEN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By
John P. Morgenstern
Deasey Mahoney & Valentini
contact info
Rufus A. Jennings
Deasey Mahoney & Valentini
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP
Represented By
John P. Morgenstern
Deasey Mahoney & Valentini
contact info
Rufus A. Jennings
Deasey Mahoney & Valentini
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
THE TRUTH TODAY FOR A BETTER TOMORROW POLITICAL COMMITTEE
Plaintiff - Appellant
TLC DREAMS FOUNDATION
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANTHONY S. MINA
Represented By
Anthony S. Mina
contact info
Plaintiff - dismissed_USCA
THE TRUTH TODAY FOR A BETTER TOMORROW POLITICAL COMMITTEE
Plaintiff - dismissed_USCA
TLC DREAMS FOUNDATION

GPO Apr 05 2017
NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: VANASKIE, SHWARTZ and FISHER, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 6.

Docket last updated: 04/06/2017 4:30 AM EDT

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.