Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald J Pappert
Case #: 2:15-cv-05452
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2015
Terminated:Nov 03, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 29, 2016 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
JUDGE ANTHONY SARCIONE
Defendant
CRISTIN KUBACKE
Defendant
ROBERT E. KYLE
Defendant
KEITH LAURER
Defendant
JOHN J. LISS
Represented By
RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Deasey, Mahoney & Valentini, Ltd
contact info
JOHN PHILIP MORGENSTERN
Deasey Mahoney & Valentini,ltd.
contact info
Defendant
RICHARD LOMBARDI
Defendant
LUMBER LIQUIDATORS
Defendant
PRESIDENT JUDGE JAMES P. MACELREE
Defendant
CHARLES MAINES
Defendant
MEDCENTER 100
Defendant
JOHN MERRICK
Defendant
JUDGE BERNARD A. MOORE
Defendant
MARK A. MURRAY
Defendant
OPTIMA WEB DESIGN/ENET
Defendant
JUDGE KATHERINE B.L. PLATT
Defendant
LUIS FELIPE RESTREPO
Defendant
ATTORNEY DAWSON RICHARD MUTH & GOLDBERG, MEANIX, MCCALLIN AND MUTH LAW FIRM
Defendant
NATHAN SHENKER
Defendant
CATHY SMITH
Defendant
EDWARD G. SMITH
Defendant
JANET SNYDER
Defendant
THE U.S. EASTERN DISTRICT COURT
Defendant
ERIC TRAJTENBERG
Defendant
JUDGE MARK L. TUNNELL
Defendant
BRYAN WALTERS
Defendant
JOSEPH M. WATERS
Defendant
WELLS FARGO BANK
Defendant
WEST CHESTER POLICE DEPARTMENT
Defendant
WEST GOSHEN POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By
RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Deasey, Mahoney & Valentini, Ltd
contact info
JOHN PHILIP MORGENSTERN
Deasey Mahoney & Valentini,ltd.
contact info
Defendant
WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP
Represented By
RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Deasey, Mahoney & Valentini, Ltd
contact info
JOHN PHILIP MORGENSTERN
Deasey Mahoney & Valentini,ltd.
contact info
Defendant
WILLIAM R. WHITEHEAD
Defendant
ROBIN KELLY
Defendant
ROSE ANDERSON
Defendant
ATTORNEY LEONARD J. RIVERA & MACELREE HARVEY LAW FIRM
Defendant
STAN BILLIE
Defendant
SCOTT BOHN
Defendant
JUDGE JOHN L. BRAXTON
Defendant
JOSEPH CARROLL
Defendant
CHESTER COUNTY
Defendant
CHESTER COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS
Defendant
CHESTER COUNTY DOMESTIC RELATIONS SECTION
Defendant
CHESTER COUNTY HOSPITAL
Defendant
JUDGE JACQUELINE CARROLL CODY
Defendant
TOM CORBETT
Defendant
DANIELLE CUGINO
Defendant
GREG CUGINO
Defendant
DAILY LOCAL NEWS COURTHOUSE
Defendant
ALAN J. DAVIS
Defendant
WILLIAM KRAUT
Defendant
MARY JONES
Defendant
SHAUNA JOHNSON
Defendant
THOMAS HOGAN
Defendant
PETER HOBART
Defendant
WILLIAM HANDY
Defendant
MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG
Defendant
CHARLES GAZA
Defendant
JUDGE THOMAS GAVIN
Defendant
MICHAEL J. DUNCAN
Defendant
LOUIS DESCHULLO
Defendant
DELAWARE COUNTY JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER
Defendant
DELAWARE COUNTY
Defendant
DAILY LOCAL NEWSPAPER
Plaintiff
TLC DREAMS FOUNDATION
Plaintiff
THE TRUTH TODAY FOR A BETTER TOMORROW POLITICAL COMMITTEE
Plaintiff
ANTHONY STOCKER MINA
100 BRIDGE ST
MALVERN, PA 19355

GPO Jul 28 2016
MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 7/28/16. 7/28/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED. (va, )
GPO Jul 28 2016
ORDER THAT ANTHONY STOCKER MINAS (MINA) MOTION FOR RECUSAL (ECF NO. 31 ) IS DENIED; MINAS MOTION FOR RELIEF OF JUDGMENT (ECF NO. 33 ) IS DENIED; MINAS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (ECF NO. 35 ) IS DENIED; MINAS MOTION FOR ECF ACCESS (ECF NO. 37 ) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 7/28/16. 7/28/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(va, )
GPO Nov 02 2018
MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 11/2/18. 11/5/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
GPO Nov 02 2018
ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS (IN CASE 18-2455) ARE GRANTED AND MINAS AMENDED COMPLAINTIS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; MINA IS ENJOINED FROM FILING OR CAUSING TO BE FILED ANY PLEADING, MOTION OR OTHER PAPER IN CIVIL ACTION NOS. 13-07622, 14-06261, 15-05452, 16-01013 AND 18-02455 OR ANY OTHER NEW PROCEEDING OR ACTION AGAINST TOM HOGAN, WILLIAM HANDY, MARK A. MURRAY, LEONARD J. RIVERA, MACELREE HARVEY, LTD. AND CHESTER COUNTY OR ANY OF ITS AGENCIES OR EMPLOYEES WITHOUT FIRST OBTAINING LEAVE OF COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 11/2/18. 11/5/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, )
GPO May 08 2019
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 05/08/2019. 05/09/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF, E-MAILED.(nd, ) Modified on 5/9/2019 (nd, ).
GPO May 08 2019
ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF DEFENDANT LUMBER LIQUIDATORS TO ENJOIN PLAINTIFF FROM ANY FURTHER FILINGS OR LAWSUITS AGAINST LUMBER LIQUIDATORS (DOCUMENT NO. 21), THE MOTION IS GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ANTHONY STOCKER MINA IS ENJOINED FROM: 1. FILING ANY PLEADING, MOTION OR PAPER IN CIVIL ACTION NOS. 13-7622, 14-6261, 15-5452, 16-1013, 18-2455, 18-5556 AND MISCELLANEOUS ACTION NOS. 14-221, 14-222, 14-254, 14-259; 2. FILING ANY NEW PROCEEDING OR ACTION RAISING ANY CLAIMS PREVIOUSLY MADE, INCLUDING THOSE RELATED TO HIS STATE COURT CIVIL AND CRIMINAL MATTERS BETWEEN 1996 AND 2019 IN CHESTER, MONTGOMERY AND DELAWARE COUNTIES, PENNSYLVANIA, WITHOUT OBTAINING LEAVE OF COURT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 05/08/2019. 05/09/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF, E-MAILED.(nd, )

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, January 07, 2021
53 53 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/08 3:52 PM
ORDER THAT THE CLERK IS DIRECTED NOT TO ACCEPT ANY OTHER PAPERS FROM MINA IN THIS AND THE OTHER CASES (CIVIL ACTION NOS. 13-07622 14-06261 15-05452 16-01013 18-02455 AND 18-05556 COVERED BY THE COURTS NOVEMBER 2, 2018 ORDER, (ECF NO. 72). THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL NOT DOCKET ANY PLEADINGS FILED IN THE ABOVE LISTED CASES. FURTHER, THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL NOT DOCKET ANY NEW CASE FILED BY MINA THAT RAISES, IN WHOLE OR IN PART, ANY CLAIMS COVERED BY THIS INJUNCTION. IF THE CLERK OF COURT RECEIVES SUCH PLEADINGS, THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO RETURN THOSE PAPERS TO MINA ALONG WITH A COPY OF THIS ORDER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 1/7/21. 1/8/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]