Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-40733

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher J Panos
Case #: 4:16-ap-04084
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2016
Terminated:Jul 31, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Massachusetts Life Sciences Center
Represented By
Massachusetts Life Sciences Center
contact info
Plaintiff
Janice Marsh
Represented By
Andrew G. Lizotte
Murphy & King
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, July 31, 2017
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 07/31 9:25 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 16-4084 settled Complaint (jk)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 07/31 9:27 AM
Adversary Case 4:16-ap-4084 Closed (jk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
16 16 order Order Mon 12/12 11:40 AM
Judgment dated 12/12/1614 Stipulation by and Between Chapter 7 Trustee and Massachusetts Life Science Center). SEE JUDGMENT FOR FULL TEXT. (jk)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order Mon 12/12 11:37 AM
Endorsed Order dated 12/12/16 Re: Related [+]. THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED AND SEPARATE JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER. THE HEARING REGARDING DOCKET NO. 10 SCHEDULED FOR DECEMBER 14, 2016 IS HEREBY CANCELLED. (jk)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation and Order By Plaintiff Janice Marsh and Massachusetts Life Sciences Center
Thursday, December 08, 2016
14 14 misc Stipulation Thu 12/08 1:46 PM
Stipulation and Order By Plaintiff Janice Marsh and Massachusetts Life Sciences Center Agreeing to Entry of Order Avoiding Liens with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff Janice Marsh (Lizotte, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Thu 11/24 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+] Notice Date 11/23/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Hearing Scheduled
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
12 12 misc Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Tue 11/22 1:43 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Janice Marsh (Lizotte, Andrew)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Judgment
Att: 1 Notice of Hearing
Monday, November 21, 2016
11 11 court Hearing Scheduled (Forms Attached) Mon 11/21 12:10 PM
Hearing Scheduled for 12/14/2016 at 02:00 PM at Worcester Courtroom 3 - CJP. Objections due by 12/9/2016 at 04:30 PM on10 Plaintiff's Motion For Entry Of Default Judgment Against Defendant, Massachusetts Life Sciences Center. (hm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2016
10 10 motion Judgment Tue 11/08 12:30 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Janice Marsh for Judgment with certificate of service. (Lizotte, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, November 04, 2016
9 9 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 11/04 4:29 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Massachusetts Life Sciences Center . (jk)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Request Fri 11/04 1:49 PM
Request from Andrew G. Lizotte Plaintiff Janice Marsh for Entry of Default with certificate of service. filed by Plaintiff Janice Marsh (Lizotte, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2016
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 10/21 12:57 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 10/20/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order
Tuesday, October 18, 2016
6 6 order Order Tue 10/18 9:19 AM
Endorsed Order dated 10/18/16 Related [+]. GRANTED. THE STIPULATION IS HEREBY APPROVED AND THE DEADLINE FOR THE DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR RESPOND IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO OCTOBER 28, 2016. (jk)
Related: [-] 4 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint
Tuesday, October 11, 2016
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/11 3:07 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Janice Marsh (Lizotte, Andrew)
Related: [-] 4 Stipulation
4 4 misc Stipulation Tue 10/11 2:59 PM
Stipulation and Order By Plaintiff Janice Marsh and Foley & Lardner, LLP to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Janice Marsh (Lizotte, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, September 19, 2016
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 09/19 1:37 PM
Summons Service Executed on Massachusetts Life Sciences Center 9/13/2016 (Lizotte, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2016
crditcrd none Mon 09/12 9:39 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-04084 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 15788806, amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, September 09, 2016
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 09/09 3:00 PM
Summons Issued on Massachusetts Life Sciences Center; Answer Due 10/11/2016. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/09 2:36 PM
Adversary case 16-04084 Complaint by Janice Marsh against Massachusetts Life Sciences Center. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property))(Lizotte, Andrew)
Related: [-]