Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher J Panos
Case #: 4:15-bk-40733
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2015
Creditor Meeting:May 21, 2015
Terminated:Oct 28, 2019

Debtor
Grove Instruments, Inc., Debtor
100 Grove St Ste 315
Worcester, MA 01605-2647
Represented By
David M. Nickless
Nickless, Phillips And O'Connor
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King
Office of US. Trustee 446 Main Street 14th Floor
Worcester, MA 01608
Trustee
Janice Marsh
Janice G Marsh, LLC 446 Main Street 19th Floor
Worcester, MA 01608
Represented By
Murphy & King
contact info
Andrew G. Lizotte
Murphy & King
contact info
Hendel & Collins, P.C.
contact info

GPO Jul 14 2017
Opinion Issued (Re: 109 Motion to Approve filed by Trustee Janice Marsh). (dr)

1. Grove Instruments files for Chapter 7 bankruptcy (telegram.com)
Submitted Thu 04/16/2015
Docket last updated: 04/15/2015 1:04 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 15, 2015
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 15-40733 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt Number 14613601, amount $ 335.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Filing Fee in the Amount of $335 Filed by Grove Instruments, Inc.. (Nickless, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 Matrix filed by Debtor Grove Instruments, Inc. (Nickless, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 Schedules D,E,F. filed by Debtor Grove Instruments, Inc. (Nickless, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule E
Att: 2 Schedule F
4 4 Statement Regarding Authority to Signa and File Petition Related [+] filed by Debtor Grove Instruments, Inc. (Nickless, David)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
5 5 Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Debtor Grove Instruments, Inc. (Nickless, David)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
6 6 Verification of Creditor Matrix Related [+] filed by Debtor Grove Instruments, Inc. (Nickless, David)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)