Furniture #19, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:13-bk-16429
Lead case is: 1:13-bk-16429
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Frank J Bailey |
Case #: | 1:13-bk-16431 |
Case Filed: | Nov 01, 2013 |
Terminated: | May 16, 2017 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jan 28, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Furniture #19, Inc.
319 Lincoln St
Hingham, MA 02043-1729 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109 |
Docket last updated: 05/16/2017 2:30 PM EDT |
Friday, November 01, 2013 | ||
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 13-16431 [misc,volp11] (1213.00). Receipt Number 13262737, amount $1213.00 (U.S. Treasury) | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() |