Building #19, Inc.
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Frank J Bailey |
Case #: | 1:13-bk-16429 |
Case Filed: | Nov 01, 2013 |
Creditor Meeting: | Dec 02, 2013 |
Terminated: | May 16, 2017 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jan 28, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Building #19, Inc.
319 Lincoln St
Hingham, MA 02043-1729 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee Chair
Paul London
27 Packard Avenue
Hull, MA 02045 |
1. | Building #19 files for bankruptcy as it looks to go out of business - Boston.com (boston.com) |
Submitted Mon 11/04/2013 | |
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago |
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case (Ch.11 Only)
Tue 05/16 2:19 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (jreg) |