Member Case
Lead case is: 1:13-bk-16429

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frank J Bailey
Case #: 1:13-bk-16433
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2013
Terminated:May 16, 2017
Plan Confirmed:Jan 28, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Beth's Basics, Inc.
319 Lincoln St
Hingham, MA 02043-1729
Represented By
Harold B. Murphy
Murphy & King, P. C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109


Docket last updated: 05/16/2017 2:30 PM EDT
Friday, November 01, 2013
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 13-16433 [misc,volp11] (1213.00). Receipt Number 13262737, amount $1213.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition with deficiencies. Filing Fee in the Amount of $1213 Filed by Beth's Basics, Inc.. (Murphy, Harold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Corporate Vote
2 2 List of 20 Largest Creditors filed by Debtor Beth's Basics, Inc. (Murphy, Harold)
Related: [-]