Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32450

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Keith L Phillips
Case #: 3:16-ap-03294
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2016
Terminated:Oct 17, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Blackhawk Mining, LLC
Represented By
Blackhawk Mining, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Speed Mining, LLC
Represented By
Speed Mining, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Dale Smith
Represented By
Dale Smith
contact info
Defendant
Shawn Endicott
Represented By
Shawn Endicott
contact info
Defendant
Debra Vaughn
Represented By
Debra Vaughn
contact info
Plaintiff
John Bolon
Represented By
John Bolon
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
9 9 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 10/17 3:34 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 28, 2018
8 8 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 09/28 12:08 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of John Bolon. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2017
7 7 court Hearing held Fri 04/21 10:17 AM
Status Hearing held; Motion to Enforce Chapter 11 Plan Injunction Take Under Advisement; Related [+]. (Rintyep)
Related: [-] 1 Order Transferring Venue-IN AP Case
Thursday, March 09, 2017
6 6 order Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Hearing Thu 03/09 9:28 AM
Scheduling Order as to Transferred Adversary Proceedings Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 4/20/2017 at 10:00 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Order Transferring Venue-IN AP Case filed by John Bolon, 5 Pre-Trial Conference Held
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
5 5 court Pre-Trial Conference Held Thu 02/23 11:55 AM
Status Conference Held; Hearing on Motions to Enforce Chapter 11 Plan Injunction to be held on April 20, 2017 at 10:00 AM. Appearance(s): William Prince; Jed Donaldson; Ronald Page; John Polak Related [+]. (Rintye, Peggy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Order Transferring Venue-IN AP Case filed by John Bolon
Tuesday, November 08, 2016
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/08 8:35 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of John Bolon. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2016
3 3 order Supplemental Order Fri 10/07 7:45 AM
Docket and additional documents filed in Bankruptcy Court Adversary Proceeding filed in US Bankruptcy Court, Southern District of West Virginia, Charleston Division Related [+](Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Order Transferring Venue-IN AP Case filed by John Bolon
Att: 1 Notice of Removal
Att: 2 Order and Notice
Att: 3 BNC Certificate
Att: 4 Motion to Transfer
Att: 5 Answer
Att: 6 Plaintiff's Statement
Att: 7 Motion to Amend Complaint
Att: 8 Response
Att: 9 Motion to Remand
Att: 10 Memorandum in Support
Att: 11 Corporate Ownership Statement
Att: 12 Response
Att: 13 Reply
Att: 14 Motion for Relief
Att: 15 Order Denying
Att: 16 Order Granting upon Reconsideration
Att: 17 BNC Certificate
Att: 18 BNC Certificate
Att: 19 Answer
Att: 20 Notice of Appearance
Att: 21 Answer
Att: 22 Notice
Att: 23 Response
Att: 24 Order to Consolidate
Att: 25 BNC Certificate
Att: 26 Response
Att: 27 Memorandum Opinion and Order
Att: 28 BNC Certificate
Att: 29 Memorandum Opinion and Order
Att: 30 BNC Certificate
Att: 31 Attorney list
Att: 32 Party list
2 2 court Acknowledgment Letter Re: Transferred Case Tue 10/04 3:35 PM
Acknowledgment Letter of Receipt of Transferred Case to Eastern District of Virginia, Richmond Division - New Case Number: 16-03294 (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
1 1 order AP Transferring Venue-IN Tue 10/04 2:53 PM
Adversary case 16-03294 Order Transferring Venue from Southern District of West Virginia, Charleston Division, Original Case number 2:16-ap-02008 filed on 02/08/2016 filed by John Bolon. Nature of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32450 (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]