Patriot Coal Corporation
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Keith L Phillips |
Case #: | 3:15-bk-32450 |
Case Filed: | May 12, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 14, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | More than $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | More than $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Patriot Coal Corporation
63 Corporate Centre Drive
Scott Depot, WV 25560 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Joseph Bean, Sr.
63 Corporate Centre Dr. Suite 400
Scott Depot, WV 25560 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:13 PM EST |
Attorney
Sands Anderson PC
1111 East Main Street (23219) P.O. Box 1998
Richmond, VA 23218 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP
750 9th St., NW, Suite 550
Washington, DC 20001 |
|
Creditor
AAA Mine Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
AAW Holdings, LLC, a West Virginia limited liability company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ACIN LLP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
AIG Assurance Company
333 N Fairfax St #204
Alexandria, VA 22314 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
c/o Sheila R.Schwager ARAMARK Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC
Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley, LLP 877 Main Street, Suite 1000 P.O. Box 1617
Boise, ID 83702 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Alderson Heirs LLC
G. Coleman Alderson 7028 Discovery Lane
Walkertown, NC 27051 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Allegheny Land Company
Once CityPlace Drive Suite 300
St. Louis, MO 63141 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Alliance Coal, LLC, Alliance Resource Properties, LLC, UC Mining, LLC, and UC Processing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Alpha Natural Resources, Inc. its affiliates, subsidiaries,
Penn, Stuart & Eskridge, PC PO Box 2009
Bristol, VA 24203 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Electric Power
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Anderson Equipment Company
P.O. Box 339
Bridgeville, PA 15017 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
ArcelorMittal USA LLC
Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP Attn: Elliot M. Smith 221 E. Fourth Street, Suite 2900
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Arch Coal, Inc.
One City Place Drive Suite 300
St. Louis, MO 63141 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Argo Insurance Company
One Boland Drive
West Orange, NJ 07052 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ark Land KH, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BIT Construction LLC
1183 Dry Hill Road
Beckley, WV 25801 |
|
Creditor
Barclays Bank PLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Black King Mine Devleopment Co
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Blue Eagle Land Company
Penn, Stuart & Eskridge, PC PO Box 2009
Bristol, VA 24203 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Blue Eagle Land, LLC
Penn, Stuart & Eskridge, PC PO Box 2009
Bristol, VA 24203 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bond Safeguard Insurance Co. and Lexon Insurance Co.
Lee E. Woodard, Esq. Harris Beach PLLC 333 West Washington St., Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Boone East Development Company
Penn, Stuart & Eskridge, P PO Box 2009
Bristol,, VA 24203 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Boyd Fabrication Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Broun Properties, LLC
Larry W. George, Esq. Co-Manager 10 Hale Street, Suite 205
Charleston, WV 25301 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
C.C. Dickinson Testamentary Trust
300 Capitol Street, Suite 1401
Charleston, WV 25401 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
CSX Transportation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CT Corporation System
4701 Cox Rd;
Glen Allen, VA 23060 |
|
Creditor
Clinton Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cassingham, LLC, a West Virginia limited liability company, et al., creditors
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cavcon, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cecil I. Walker Machinery Co.
10001 Linn Station Road
Louisville, KY 40223 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Chesapeake Mining Company, a West Virginia corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Claims Recovery Group LLC
92 Union Avenue
Cresskill, NJ 07626 |
|
Creditor
Cole & Crane Real Estate Trust
Phillip G. Montague, Chief Engineer 940 Fourth Avenue, Suite 215
Huntington, WV 25701 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gary C Conley
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Maria L Conley
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cortland Capital Market Services LLC
200 South 10th Street 16th floor
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Courtney Company
P. O. Box 90
Roanoke, VA 24002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Crown Parts & Machine
Sands Anderson PC PO Box 1998
Richmond, VA 23218 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
D-A Lubricant Company, Inc.
801 Edwards Drive
Lebanon, IN 46052 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Daniels Electric, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gary Deal
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Debtor in Possession Facility Lenders
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Deutsche Bank
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dickinson Properties, LLC, a West Virginia limited liability company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dickinson Testamentary Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dom-Ex LLC
Sands Anderson PC PO Box 1998
Richmond, VA 23218 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dorothy, LLC, a West Virginia limited liability company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ecko, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shawn Endicott
Spilman Thomas & Battle PLLC P. O. Box 90
Roanoke, VA 24002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fifth Third Bank
707 Grant Street Suite 2200
Pittsburgh, PA 15219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
GE Capital TMS
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Garland Fork LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gelco Corporation d/b/a Element Fleet Management as successor in interest to GE Fleet Services
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gelco Corporation d/b/a GE Fleet Services
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
General Electric Capital Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Guardco Security LLC
PO Box 64
Belfry, KY 41514 |
|
Creditor
H-E Parts Mining
Sands Anderson PO Box 1998
Richmond, VA 23218 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
H.A. Robson Trust, et al.
Bradford F. Englander 3190 Fairview Park Drive, Suite 300
Falls Church, VA 22042 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Barry Shawn Harvey
P. O. Box 776
Madison, WV 25130 |
|
Creditor
Bennett K. Hatfield
Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. P.O. Box 500
Richmond, VA 23218 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Angela Hensley
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hope Gas, Inc., d/b/a Dominion Hope
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Horse Creek Coal Land Company
4020 Green Mount Crossing Dr., Suite 304
Shiloh, IL 62269 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Horse Creek Land and Mining Company, a West Virginia corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Heath Huffman
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
WC Hydraulics, LLC
Gentry Locke 900 SunTrust Plaza P.O. Box 40013
Roanoke, VA 24022 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Illinois Department of Natural Resources
500 South Second Street
Springfield, IL 62706 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Illinois Environmental Protection Agency
Office of the Attorney General 500 South Second Street
Springfield, IL 62704 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Imperial Coal Company, a West Virginia corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Indemnity National Insurance Company
Stites & Harbison PLLC 250 West Main Street Suite 2300
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Industrial Supply Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
J&R Repairs, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
J.L. Knight Jr. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
James River Coal Terminal, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
K Rail, LLC
P. O. Box 90
Roanoke, VA 24002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kanawha Rail, LLC
P. O. Box 90
Roanoke, VA 24002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kanawha Scales and Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kay Ford James Heirs
139 Lamplighter Dr.
Morgantown, WV 26508 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kentucky Utilities Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kinder Morgan Resources
10953 Vista Lake Ct.
Navasota, TX 77868 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kinder Morgan Resources, LLC
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLP Michael E. Hastings, Esq. 114 Market Street Suite 210
Roanoke, VA 24011 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Komatsu Financial Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
LML-AAW Holdings, LLC, a West Virginia limited liability
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
LaFollette Holdings, Ltd.
Alice A. Wright, Ph.D., M.B.A. Manager 6219 McNaughten Place Lane
Columbus, OH 43213 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jesika Legg
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kevin Lester
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Little Coal Land Company
Torrey Evans, President Union Building, 14th Floor 723 Kanawha Blvd., East
Charleston, WV 25301 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Loadout, LLC
P. O. Box 90
Roanoke, VA 24002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Longwall Associates, Inc.
Penn, Stuart & Eskridge, PC PO Box 2009
Bristol, VA 24203 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lorado, LLC, a West Virginia limited liability company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lusk Disposal Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Macquarie Corporate & Asset Funding, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Macquarie Corporate and Asset Funding Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Malden, LLC, a West Virginia limited liability company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
David McEndree
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brittaney McGhee
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shannon McGhee
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mercer (US) Inc.
Marsh & McLennan Companies 1166 Avenue of the Americas, Legal Dept. 1166 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Michelin North America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mine Battery Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mohler Lumber Company
Spilman Thomas & Battle PLLC P. O. Box 90
Roanoke, VA 24002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Monongahela Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jeffery A Musgrove
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NRP (Operating) LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Natural Resource Partners L.P.
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nelle Ratrie Chilton, & Charles C. Dickinson, Ill, Co-Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NexGen Industrial Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Numares Group Corporation
737 N. 5 Street
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Official Retiree Committee
Stahl Cowen Crowley Addis LLC 55 West Monroe St. Suite 1200
Chicago, IL 60603 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ohio Department of Natural Resources
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ohio Department of Taxation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Old Republic Insurance Co.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter Nemer Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St., 17th
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pardee Minerals, LLC
P. O. Box 90
Roanoke, VA 24002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Eugene Payne
9 Forest Drive
Charleston, WV 25302 |
|
Creditor
Payne-Gallatin Company, a West Virginia corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Peabody Energy Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Peabody Terminals, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Penn Virginia Operating Co., LLC
P. O. Box 90
Roanoke, VA 24002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
People's Capital and Leasing Corp.
Attn. Theresa A. Driscoll 400 Garden City Plaza
Garden City, NY 11530 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Marilyn S. Perry
P. O. Box 301
Keslers Cross Lanes, WV 26675 |
|
Creditor
Phillips Machine Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pillar Innovations, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pocahontas Land Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Powell Construction Company, Inc.
P. O. Box 90
Roanoke, VA 24002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Prairie Dock Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Prairie Dock Company, LLC and Prairie Mining Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Prairie Mining Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Quality Magnetite, LLC
P.O. Box 347
Kenova, WV 25530 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Quincy Center, a West Virginia partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Quincy Coal Company, a West Virginia corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
RBL-AAW Holdings, LLC
Larry W. George, Esq., Co-Manager Law Office of Larry W. George, PLLC One Bridge Place, Suite 205
Charleston, WV 25301 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Realco Limited Liability Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Republic Bank, Inc.
Glenn R. Bronson 15 West South Temple, Suite 1700
Salt Lake City, UT 84101 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rhino Eastern LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rhino Energy WV, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rodney T. Riser, Jr.
4830 Empire Parkway
Chester, VA 23831 |
|
Creditor
Vickie Robinette
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rogers Petroleum Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
George Runion
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SGS North America, Inc.
30 Columbia Turnpike Suite 202
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Creditor
Delane Schoolcraft
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jennifer Schoolcraft
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Security America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shepard Boone Coal Company LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shepard Booone Coal Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shonk Land Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Siemens Financial Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC
19772 MacArthur Blvd # 200
Irvine, CA 92612 |
|
Creditor
Dale Smith
Spilman Thomas & Battle PLLC P. O. Box 90
Roanoke, VA 24002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nancy A. Smith
|
|
Creditor
Standard Laboratories, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
State Electric Supply Co
2010 Second Avenue
Huntington, WV 25703 |
|
Creditor
State Electric Supply Company
2010 Second Avenue
Huntington, WV 25703 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
State of Michigan, Department of Treasury
Cadillac Place 3030 W. Grand Blvd., Ste. 10-200
Detroit, MI 48202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stollings Trucking Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stowers Fire and Safety Equipment
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Suncrest Resources, LLC
P. O. Box 90
Roanoke, VA 24002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tannor Partners Credit Fund LP
150 Grand Street, Suite 401
White Plains, NY 10601 |
|
Creditor
The Federal Insurance Company
4940 Dominion Boulevard
Glen Allen, VA 23060 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The UMWA Combined Benefit Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Toney Fork, LLC
P. O. Box 90
Roanoke, VA 24002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Natasha N Townsend
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Stites & Harbison 250 West Main Street Suite 2300
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
UMR, Inc.
One Constitution Plaza
Hartford, CT 06103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
UMWA Combined Benefit Fund and its Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UMWA Health and Retirement Funds
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
US Bank National Association, as trustee
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
US Specialty Insurance
Stites & Harbison, PLLC 250 W. Main Street Suite 2300
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bradley D Ullum
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Leasing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Mine Workers of America
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States of America, Department of Labor
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States of America, Internal Revenue Service
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Debra Vaughn
Spilman Thomas & Battle PLLC P. O. Box 90
Roanoke, VA 24002 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vossloh Track Material Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
WPP LLC
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
West Penn Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Stites & Harbison, PLLC 250 W. Main Street Suite 2300
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Whayne Supply Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Roger Wyciskalla
4468 State Hwy 154
Sesser, IL 62884 |
|
Creditor
Gina Young
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
20 North 8th Street, Second Floor
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Blackhawk Mining LLC
411 E. Franklin St. Suite 600
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Coastal Capital International, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Energy& Env Cabinet Commonwealth of Kentucky
Office of General Counsel 2 Hudson Hollow
Frankfort, KY 40601 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Commonwealth of Kentucky, Kentucky Labor Cabinet, Department of Workers' Claims
P.O. Box 1320
Richmond, VA 23218 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Commonwealth of Kentucky, Public Protection Cabinet, Department of Insurance
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Benny Dixon
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
ERP Compliant Fuels, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
ERP Environmental Fund, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Steven Godby
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Kentucky Coal Employers' Self-Insurance Guaranty Fund
P.O. Box 1320
Richmond, VA 23218 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Mercer Health & Benefits LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Moody's Investors Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Charlene Necessary
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Rodney Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sherri Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Official Retiree Committee
Stahl Cowen Crowley Addis LLC 55 West Monroe St. Suite 1200
Chicago, IL 60603 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition
8270 Greensboro Drive Suite 700
Tysons Corner, VA 22102 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Peabody Holding Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
SG Equipment Finance USA Corp. (SGEF
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sierra Club
8270 Greensboro Drive Suite 700
Tysons Corner, VA 22102 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
TR Capital Management, LLC
PO BOX 633
Woodmere, NY 11598 |
|
Interested Party
The Employment Clients
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Retiree VEBA Trust
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United Mine Workers of America
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United Mine Workers of America 1974 Pension Plan and Trust
Crowley, Liberatore, Ryan & Brogan, PC 150 Boush Street
Norfolk, VA 23510 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Virginia Conservation Legacy Fund, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Virginia Electric and Power Company d/b/a Dominion Virginia Power
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Dennis Wellman
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
West Virginia Department of Environmental Protection
601 57th Street
Charleston, WV 25304 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
West Virginia Employment Plaintiffs
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
West Virginia Highlands Conservancy
8270 Greensboro Drive Suite 700
Tysons Corner, VA 22102 |
Represented By
|
Liquidator
PCC Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Other Professional
Underhill Partners, L.P.
|
|
Other Professional
Zolfo Cooper, LLC
|
|
Professional
Hunton & Williams LLP
|
Represented By
|
Trustee
Eugene Davis, solely in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee for the PCC Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Judy A. Robbins
Office of the U.S. Trustee - Region 4 -R 701 E. Broad Street, Suite 4304
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
CT Corporation System
|
|
Unknown
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
James Garfield Hairston
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Honey Island Coal Co., LLC
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
The Corporation Trust Company
|
|
Unknown
UMWA 1992 Benefit Plan and its Trustees
|
Represented By
|
1. | Clinton blasts Patriot Coal bankruptcy plan : Business (stltoday.com) |
Submitted Mon 10/05/2015 | |
2. | Blackhawk wins Patriot Coal bankruptcy auction (reuters.com) |
Submitted Wed 09/23/2015 | |
3. | Patriot Coal Files Modified Plan Based on Possible New Bidder (bloomberg.com) |
Submitted Tue 09/22/2015 | |
4. | Patriot Coal Approved to Poll Creditors on Chapter 11 Plan (blogs.wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 08/20/2015 | |
5. | Patriot tries to shake liabilities through bankruptcy (statejournal.com) |
Submitted Mon 08/03/2015 | |
6. | Bankruptcy: Amid More Objections To Blackhawk Deal, Patriot Eases Some Bid Terms (forbes.com) |
Submitted Tue 06/23/2015 | |
7. | Patriot Coal in Deal to Sell to Blackhawk Mining (wsj.com) |
Submitted Thu 06/04/2015 | |
8. | Peabody lists liabilities in Patriot bankruptcy (bizjournals.com) |
Submitted Tue 06/02/2015 | |
9. | Patriot Coal Again Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (wsj.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/13/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago |