Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32450

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Keith L Phillips
Case #: 3:16-ap-03300
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2016
Terminated:Oct 17, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Blackhawk Mining, LLC
Represented By
Blackhawk Mining, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Appalachia Mine Services, LLC
Represented By
Appalachia Mine Services, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Colin Milam
Represented By
Colin Milam
contact info
Defendant
Bobby Stover
Represented By
Bobby Stover
contact info
Defendant
Greg Dotson
Represented By
Greg Dotson
contact info
Plaintiff
Jackie Earl Terherst
Represented By
Jackie Earl Terherst
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
8 8 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 10/17 3:37 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 28, 2018
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 09/28 12:10 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of Jackie Earl Terherst. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2017
6 6 court Hearing held Fri 04/21 10:26 AM
Status Hearing held; Motion to Enforce Chapter 11 Plan Injunction Take Under Advisement; Related [+]. (Rintyep)
Related: [-] 1Order Transferring Venue-IN AP Case
Thursday, March 09, 2017
5 5 order Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Hearing Thu 03/09 9:38 AM
Scheduling Order as to Transferred Adversary Proceedings Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 4/20/2017 at 10:00 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Order Transferring Venue-IN AP Case filed by Jackie Earl Terherst, 4 Pre-Trial Conference Held
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
4 4 court Pre-Trial Conference Held Thu 02/23 12:01 PM
Status Conference Held; Motions to Enforce Chapter 11 Plan Injunction to be held on April 20, 2017 at 10:00 AM. Appearance(s): William Prince; Jed Donaldson; Ronald Page; John Polak; Related [+]. (Rintye, Peggy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Order Transferring Venue-IN AP Case filed by Jackie Earl Terherst
Tuesday, November 08, 2016
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/08 8:47 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of Jackie Earl Terherst. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2016
2 2 court Acknowledgment Letter Re: Transferred Case Fri 10/07 10:39 AM
Acknowledgment Letter of Receipt of Transferred Case to Eastern District of Virginia, Richmond Division - New Case Number: 16-03300 (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
1 1 order AP Transferring Venue-IN Fri 10/07 10:03 AM
Adversary case 16-03300 Order Transferring Venue from Southern District of West Virginia, Charleston Division, Original Case number 16-02012 filed on 02/12/2016 filed by Jackie Earl Terherst. Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32450 (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal
Att: 2 Motion to Transfer
Att: 3 Answer
Att: 4 Plaintiff's Statement
Att: 5 Order and Notice of Removal
Att: 6 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Att: 7 Motion to File Amended Complaint
Att: 8 Response
Att: 9 Motion to Remand Case to Circuit Court
Att: 10 Memorandum in Support
Att: 11 Corporate Ownership Statement
Att: 12 Response
Att: 13 Reply
Att: 14 Motion for Relief
Att: 15 Answer
Att: 16 Order Denying
Att: 17 Order Granting
Att: 18 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Att: 19 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Att: 20 Notice of Appearance
Att: 21 Answer
Att: 22 Notice
Att: 23 Response
Att: 24 Order to Consolidate
Att: 25 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Att: 26 Docket Sheet