Reid v. United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804 et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Laura Taylor Swain |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-08021 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | 28:1441lm Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio |
Case Filed: | Oct 13, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 11, 2017 5:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
Christopher Sabatino
|
|
Defendant
United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark A. Reid
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 11/20 2:02 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to27 Corrected Notice of Appeal, filed by Mark A. Reid. USCA Case Number 17-2141 Ordered that the appeal is DISMISSED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 11/20/2017. (nd) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 07/06 5:50 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL. Document filed by Mark A. Reid. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Carbonaro, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
service
Certificate of Service Other
Tue 03/07 3:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum served on Joseph W. Carbonaro, Christopher Sabatino on 03/07/2017. Service was made by mail. Document filed by United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804. (Jensen, Tara) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Tue 03/07 12:42 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804. (Jensen, Tara) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 02/27 4:05 PM
ORDER: granting17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The foregoing briefing schedule is approved, nunc pro tunc. DE # 17 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/27/2017) (ama) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Wed 02/22 11:12 AM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Joseph William Carbonaro on behalf of Mark A. Reid. Re:18 CROSS MOTION to Remand to State Court .,19 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. (Carbonaro, Joseph) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Wed 02/22 10:52 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by Mark A. Reid. (Carbonaro, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Remand to State Court
Tue 02/21 6:02 PM
CROSS MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Mark A. Reid.(Carbonaro, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 01/19 5:42 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Joseph W. Carbonaro dated 01/19/17. Document filed by Mark A. Reid.(Carbonaro, Joseph) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/19 4:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph William Carbonaro on behalf of Mark A. Reid. (Carbonaro, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 01/18 4:51 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is adjourned to July 28, 2017, at 10:00 AM and the related deadlines are modified accordingly. DE # 14 resolved. Initial Conference set for 7/28/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/18/2017) (cf) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 01/17 10:42 AM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Tara Jensen dated 1/17/17. Document filed by United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804.(Jensen, Tara) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Certificate of Service Other
Thu 01/12 2:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings served on Joseph W. Carbonaro and Christopher Sabatino on 1/12/17. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804. (Jensen, Tara) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Thu 01/12 12:36 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . . Document filed by United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804. (Jensen, Tara) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Thu 01/12 12:36 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Document filed by United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804.(Jensen, Tara) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service Other
Fri 11/18 4:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Conference Order, Correspondence to Court served on Joseph W. Carbonaro and Christopher Sabatino on November 18, 2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804. (Jensen, Tara) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Fri 11/18 4:20 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Tara Jensen dated November 18, 2016 re: Requested Removal Information. Document filed by United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804.(Jensen, Tara) |
|
Saturday, November 05, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 11/07 8:27 AM
INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/20/2017 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 12D, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/5/2016) (mro) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Fri 10/21 9:04 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Nelson Stephen Roman is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) |
||
utility
Case Redesignation
Fri 10/21 9:04 AM
Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so redesignated. (wb) |
||
Tuesday, October 18, 2016 | ||
7 | 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer served on Joseph W. Carbonaro on 10/18/16. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804. (Jensen, Tara) | |
Monday, October 17, 2016 | ||
6 | 6 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804.(Jensen, Tara) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
5 | 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Mark A. Reid, Christopher Sabatino on 10/14/16. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804. (Jensen, Tara) | |
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
4 | 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804.(Jensen, Tara) | |
3 | 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Jensen, Tara) | |
2 | 2 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 25763/2016E.amending1 Notice of Removal.Document filed by United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804. Related document:1 Notice of Removal, filed by United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804.(Jensen, Tara) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 25763/2016E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12868679).Document filed by United Brotherhood of Teamsters North Atlantic District Local 804.(Jensen, Tara) | |
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (vf) | ||
Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. (vf) | ||
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |