Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32450

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Keith L Phillips
Case #: 3:16-ap-03320
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2016
Terminated:Oct 18, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
John Doe LLC
Represented By
John Doe LLC
contact info
Defendant
Colin Milam
Represented By
Colin Milam
contact info
Defendant
Greg Dotson
Represented By
Greg Dotson
contact info
Defendant
Blackhawk Mining, LLC
Represented By
Blackhawk Mining, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Harold Woods
Represented By
Ronald A. Page, Jr.
Ronald Page, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, October 18, 2018
8 8 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 10/18 8:22 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 28, 2018
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 09/28 12:15 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of Harold Woods. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2017
6 6 court Hearing held Fri 04/21 10:29 AM
Status Hearing held; Motion to Enforce Chapter 11 Plan Injunction Take Under Advisement; Related [+]. (Rintyep)
Related: [-] 1Order Transferring Venue-IN AP Case
Thursday, March 09, 2017
5 5 order Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Hearing Thu 03/09 9:56 AM
Scheduling Order as to Transferred Adversary Proceedings Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 4/20/2017 at 10:00 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Order Transferring Venue-IN AP Case filed by Harold Woods, 4 Pre-Trial Conference Held
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
4 4 court Pre-Trial Conference Held Thu 02/23 4:00 PM
Status Conference Held; Motions to Enforce Chapter 11 Plan Injunction to be held on April 20, 2017 at 10:00 AM. Appearance(s): William Prince; Jed Donaldson; Ronald Page; John Polak; Related [+]. (Rintye, Peggy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Order Transferring Venue-IN AP Case filed by Harold Woods
Tuesday, November 08, 2016
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/08 8:49 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of Harold Woods. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2016
2 2 court Acknowledgment Letter Re: Transferred Case Fri 10/28 10:09 AM
Acknowledgment Letter of Receipt of Transferred Case to Eastern District of Virginia, Richmond Division - New Case Number: 16-03320 (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-]
1 1 order AP Transferring Venue-IN Fri 10/28 10:00 AM
Adversary case 16-03320 Order Transferring Venue from Southern District of West Virginia, Charleston Division, Original Case number 16-02029 filed on 03/04/2016 filed by Harold Woods. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32450 (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal
Att: 2 Motion to Transfer Venue
Att: 3 Report
Att: 4 Motion to Remand Case to Circuit Court
Att: 5 Memorandum in Support
Att: 6 Answer
Att: 7 Response
Att: 8 Order and Notice
Att: 9 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Att: 10 Corporate Ownership Statement
Att: 11 Third-Party Complaint
Att: 12 Third Party Summons Issued
Att: 13 Third Party Summons Transmitted
Att: 14 Response
Att: 15 Reply
Att: 16 Summons Service Executed
Att: 17 Motion for Leave to File Limited Surreply Brief
Att: 18 Motion for Relief
Att: 19 Return of Service
Att: 20 Answer
Att: 21 Order Denying Motion
Att: 22 Order Graning Motion upon reconsideration
Att: 23 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Att: 24 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Att: 25 Notice
Att: 26 Response
Att: 27 Order to Consolidate
Att: 28 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Att: 29 Docket Sheet