Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32450

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Keith L Phillips
Case #: 3:16-ap-03329
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2016
Terminated:Oct 18, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Blackhawk Mining, LLC
Represented By
Blackhawk Mining, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Panther Creek Mining, LLC
Represented By
Panther Creek Mining, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Debra Vaughn
Represented By
Debra Vaughn
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Richardson
Represented By
Ronald A. Page, Jr.
Ronald Page, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, October 18, 2018
8 8 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 10/18 8:26 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 28, 2018
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 09/28 12:32 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of Paul Richardson. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2017
6 6 court Hearing held Fri 04/21 10:34 AM
Status Hearing held; Motion to Enforce Chapter 11 Plan Injunction Take Under Advisement; Related [+]. (Rintyep)
Related: [-] 1Order Transferring Venue-IN AP Case
Thursday, March 09, 2017
5 5 order Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Hearing Thu 03/09 10:06 AM
Scheduling Order as to Transferred Adversary Proceedings Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 4/20/2017 at 10:00 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Order Transferring Venue-IN AP Case filed by Paul Richardson, 4 Pre-Trial Conference Held
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
4 4 court Pre-Trial Conference Held Thu 02/23 12:13 PM
Status Conference Held; Motions to Enforce Chapter 11 Plan Injunction to be held on April 20, 2017 at 10:00 AM. Appearance(s): William Prince; Jed Donaldson; Ronald Page; John Polak Related [+]. (Rintye, Peggy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Order Transferring Venue-IN AP Case filed by Paul Richardson
Tuesday, November 08, 2016
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/08 8:42 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ronald A. Page Jr. of Ronald Page, PLC on behalf of Paul Richardson. (Page, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2016
2 2 court Acknowledgment Letter Re: Transferred Case Mon 10/31 3:20 PM
Acknowledgment Letter of Receipt of Transferred Case to Eastern District of Virginia, Richmond Division - New Case Number: 16-03329 (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
1 1 order AP Transferring Venue-IN Mon 10/31 3:17 PM
Adversary case 16-03329 Order Transferring Venue from Southern District of West Virginia, Charleston Division, Original Case number 16-02048 filed on 08/05/2016 filed by Paul Richardson. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32450 (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal
Att: 2 Corporate Ownership Statement
Att: 3 Corporate Ownership Statement
Att: 4 Motion to Transfer
Att: 5 Order and Notice
Att: 6 Statement
Att: 7 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Att: 8 Answer
Att: 9 Motion to Remand
Att: 10 Memorandum
Att: 11 Response
Att: 12 Third-Party Complaint
Att: 13 Third Party Summons
Att: 14 Response
Att: 15 Summons Service
Att: 16 Reply
Att: 17 Memorandum Opinion and Order
Att: 18 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Att: 19 Docket Sheet