Veros Energy, LLC v. GCube Insurance Services, Inc. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70470
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70470
Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jennifer H Henderson |
Case #: | 7:16-ap-70021 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other |
Case Filed: | Nov 10, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 12, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
GCube Insurance Services, Inc.
3101 West Coast Highway Ste. 100
Newport Beach, CA 92663 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kiln Syndicate 510
750 Seventh Ave. 24th Floor
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Veros Energy, LLC
12982 Cherokee Bend Drive
Moundville, AL 35474 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:05 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 12, 2020 | ||
287 | 287
order
District Court re: Appeal
Thu 03/12 1:38 PM
Final Order By District Court Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala, Re: Appeal on Civil Action Number: 17-mc-00102-MHH, Dismissed Signed on 3/12/2020. (meb) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 03/12 1:43 PM
Adversary Case 7:16-ap-70021 Closed (meb) |
||
Tuesday, March 10, 2020 | ||
286 | 286
court
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 03/10 5:37 PM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal By GCube Insurance Services, Inc., Kiln Syndicate 510 and Between Plaintiff Veros Energy, LLC Filed by Defendants GCube Insurance Services, Inc., Kiln Syndicate 510. (Hunter, Seth) |