Alma Products I, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-13245
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-13245
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-13258 |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 05, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Alma Products I, Inc.
7350 Young Dr
Walton Hills, OH 44146-5357 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago |
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 02/05 2:34 PM
Case Closed. (Richards, Beverly) |
||
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order, Final Decree
Fri 01/19 10:26 AM
Final Decree Signed on 1/19/2018 (I) Closing Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Terminating Appointment of Claims and Noticing Agent. (Nulty, Lynda) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Amended Schedules
Fri 01/27 6:02 PM
Amended Schedules filed:, Schedule G - Non-Individual Filed by Jennifer J. Hardy on behalf of Alma Products I, Inc.. (Hardy, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Schedules
Fri 12/23 12:35 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Jennifer J. Hardy on behalf of Alma Products I, Inc.. (Hardy, Jennifer) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Fri 12/23 12:34 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Jennifer J. Hardy on behalf of Alma Products I, Inc.. (Hardy, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Mon 11/28 9:18 AM
Case Joint Administration. All Entries Shall Be Made In Lead Case No. 16-13245 (Richards, Beverly) |
||
misc
Add Claims and Noticing Agent
Mon 11/28 10:37 AM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent, added to the case. (Richards, Beverly) |
||
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Tue 11/22 12:34 PM
Order Signed on 11/22/2016 Approving Joint Administration of Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. All Entries Shall Be Made In Lead Case No. 16-13245 (Nulty, Lynda) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
misc
Add Judge
Mon 11/21 8:10 AM
Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 11/21 11:34 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-13258 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 198775. Fee amount 1717.00. (Porter) |
||
Sunday, November 20, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
ans
Declaration
Sun 11/20 3:37 PM
Declaration of Joseph Santangelo in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and First Day Pleadings filed by Jennifer J. Hardy on behalf of Alma Products I, Inc.. (Hardy, Jennifer) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Sun 11/20 3:35 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Jennifer J. Hardy on behalf of Alma Products I, Inc.. (Hardy, Jennifer) |
|
1 | 1
25
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 11/20 3:26 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Rachel C. Strickland of Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP on behalf of Alma Products I, Inc.. (Strickland, Rachel) |