DACCO/Detroit of Chattanooga, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-13245
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-13245
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-13266 |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 05, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
DACCO/Detroit of Chattanooga, Inc.
7350 Young Dr
Walton Hills, OH 44146-5357 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 02/05 2:43 PM
Case Closed. (Richards, Beverly) |
||
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order, Final Decree
Fri 01/19 10:43 AM
Final Decree Signed on 1/19/2018 (I) Closing Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Terminating Appointment of Claims and Noticing Agent. (Nulty, Lynda) |
|
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Schedules
Fri 12/23 12:58 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Jennifer J. Hardy on behalf of DACCO/Detroit of Chattanooga, Inc.. (Hardy, Jennifer) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Fri 12/23 12:57 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Jennifer J. Hardy on behalf of DACCO/Detroit of Chattanooga, Inc.. (Hardy, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Mon 11/28 9:27 AM
Case Jointly Administered. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of DACCO Transmission Parts (NY), Inc. and its affiliates that have concurrently commenced chapter 11 cases. The docket in the chapter 11 case of DACCO Transmission Parts (NY), Inc., Case No. 16-13245 (MKV), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Richards, Beverly) |
||
misc
Add Claims and Noticing Agent
Mon 11/28 10:48 AM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent, added to the case. (Richards, Beverly) |
||
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Tue 11/22 1:24 PM
Order Signed on 11/22/2016 Approving Joint Administration of Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. All Entries Shall Be Made In Lead Case No. 16-13245 (Nulty, Lynda) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
misc
Add Judge
Mon 11/21 8:12 AM
Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 11/21 11:34 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-13266 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 198775. Fee amount 1717.00. (Porter) |
||
Sunday, November 20, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
ans
Declaration
Sun 11/20 4:12 PM
Declaration of Joseph Santangelo in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and First Day Pleadings filed by Jennifer J. Hardy on behalf of DACCO/Detroit of Chattanooga, Inc.. (Hardy, Jennifer) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Sun 11/20 4:09 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Jennifer J. Hardy on behalf of DACCO/Detroit of Chattanooga, Inc.. (Hardy, Jennifer) |
|
1 | 1
25
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 11/20 4:06 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Rachel C. Strickland of Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP on behalf of DACCO/Detroit of Chattanooga, Inc.. (Strickland, Rachel) |