Koller v. Brown et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Referred: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:16-cv-07069 |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Cause | 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Case Filed: | Dec 09, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 07, 2017 2:47 AM PDT |
Defendant
Kamala D. Harris
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alex Padilla
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Xavier Becerra
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Dft
California Republican Party
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Dft
Donald J. Trump
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vinzenz J. Koller
4010 Sorrento Valley Blvd. Suite 400
San Diego, CA 92121 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Jerry Brown
Terminated: 01/11/2017
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Pla
Gregory Kaighn
Terminated: 06/02/2017
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Pla
Janis Kaighn
Terminated: 06/02/2017
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit filed over Electoral College in an effort to undermine Trump's presidential victory (montereycountyweekly.com) |
Submitted Mon 12/12/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
117 | 117
![]() JUDGMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that judgment is entered in favor of Defendants consistent with the Order Granting Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/20/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018) |
|
116 | 116
![]() ORDER granting 87 , 88 , 94 Motions to Dismiss. Judgment will be entered in favor of Defendants, and THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THIS FILE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/20/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
115 | 115
![]() ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
114 | 114
![]() ORDER granting 109 Administrative Motion. A Case Management Conference is hereby scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on 5/3/2018. The parties are advised an order on the pending motions to dismiss will issue no later than 4/20/2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/13/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2018) |
|
113 | 113
![]() Statement of Recent Decision by Xavier Becerra, Kamala D. Harris, Alex Padilla. (Li, Peiyin) (Filed on 4/13/2018) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/16 9:59 AM
***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF114 Order: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2018) |