Original Case: 5:16-cv-07069

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-17283
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit441 Civil Rights - Voting
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2016
Terminated:Dec 21, 2016
Last checked: Friday Dec 23, 2016 12:41 AM PST
Defendant - Appellee
EDMUND G. BROWN, Jr., Governor of the State of California, in his official capacity
Represented By
Kevin A. Calia
AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KAMALA D. HARRIS, Attorney General, Attorney General for the State of California, in her official capacity
Represented By
Kevin A. Calia
AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ALEX PADILLA, Secretary of State for the State of California, in his official capacity
Represented By
Kevin A. Calia
AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
VINZENZ J. KOLLER, an individual and Presidential Elector
Represented By
Andrew J. Dhuey
Andrew J. Dhuey, Attorney at Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/23/2016 12:31 AM PST
Friday, December 16, 2016
2 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [10236768] (RT) [Entered: 12/16/2016 01:41 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 COURT CORRECTION: Entry #1 skipped on docket due to clerical error. [10236842] (TYL) [Entered: 12/16/2016 02:01 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: ME): The appeal filed December 16, 2016 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than January 13, 2017; the answering brief is due February 10, 2017 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). The parties are reminded that streamlined requests for extensions of time are not available in preliminary injunction appeals. See http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/content/view.php?pk_id=0000000638. Any request for an extension of time must be requested under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [10237377] (ME) [Entered: 12/16/2016 03:56 PM]
Related: [-]