Columbus Hill Capital Management,L.P. v. Peabody Energy Corporation, a Delaware Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:16-bk-42529
Lead BK case is: 4:16-bk-42529
Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Judge: | Barry S Schermer |
Case #: | 4:16-ap-04183 |
Case Filed: | Dec 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Spencer Fane LLP 1 North Brentwood Suite 1000
St Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Peabody Energy Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, for itself and each of its direct and indirect debtor subsidiaries
701 Market Street
St. Louis, MO 63101 |
Represented By
Peabody Energy Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, for itself and each of its direct and indirect debtor subsidiaries
contact info |
Plaintiff
Columbus Hill Capital Management,L.P.
10326 Old Olive Street Rd.
St. Louis, MO 63141 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 1:08 PM CDT |
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 02/06 12:30 PM
Adversary Case 4:16-ap-4183 Closed (cro, d) |
||
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 01/12 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 01/12 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 01/11 7:20 PM
Certificate of Service of Aljaira Duarte re: 1) Order Granting Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding and 2) Judgment on Order on Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Other Professional Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC . (Gershbein, Evan) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment
Tue 01/10 9:10 AM
Judgment . (pas, s) |
|
17 | 17
order
Dismissing Case - AP
Tue 01/10 9:08 AM
Order Dismissing Case . (pas, s) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 01/10 9:10 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:16-ap-4183 Dismissed (pas, s) |
||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Mon 01/09 2:17 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff Columbus Hill Capital Management LP. (Breidenbach, Robert) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 01/06 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 01/05/2017. (Admin.) |
|
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 01/06 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 01/05/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 01/03 10:36 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian M. Clarke (moe, j) |
|
12 | 12
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 01/03 10:34 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul N. Silverstein (moe, j) |
|
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Tue 01/03 4:12 PM
Receipt Number 5745339, Fee Amount $100.00 (rit, m) |
||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Tue 01/03 4:13 PM
Receipt Number 5745259, Fee Amount $100.00 (rit, m) |
||
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 12/30 12:09 PM
Certificate of Service of Heather Montgomery re: Orders served December 29, 2016 Filed by Other Professional Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC . (Gershbein, Evan) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 12/29 3:03 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian M. Clarke Filed by Plaintiff Columbus Hill Capital Management,L.P. (Breidenbach, Robert) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 12/29 3:02 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul N. Silverstein Filed by Plaintiff Columbus Hill Capital Management,L.P. (Breidenbach, Robert) |
|
8 | 8
court
Resend Document
Thu 12/29 2:39 PM
Resend Document (pot, t) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order (Generic)
Thu 12/29 2:26 PM
Order Denying . (pot, t) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2016 (pot, t) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Support/Supplement
Thu 12/29 11:51 AM
Support/Supplement Re: Filed by Plaintiff Columbus Hill Capital Management,L.P. . (Breidenbach, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
5 | 5
order
Generic Order
Thu 12/29 11:36 AM
Order Pursuant to Section 105 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 7065 Granting in part, Denying in part Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (kru, l) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Generic)
Thu 12/29 10:49 AM
Notice and Joinder Certificate of Service: Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Hardy, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Wed 12/28 3:06 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-04183 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 13349974, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Generic Motion
Wed 12/28 3:05 PM
Motion to Temporary Restraining Order Filed by Plaintiff Columbus Hill Capital Management,L.P. (Breidenbach, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 12/28 3:03 PM
Adversary case 16-04183 Complaint by Columbus Hill Capital Management,L.P. (attorney Robert A. Breidenbach ) against Peabody Energy Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, for itself and each of its direct and indirect debtor subsidiaries Fee Amount $350.(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other))(Breidenbach, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Adv. Cover Sheet |