Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Jonker
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:17-cv-00004
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2017
Terminated:Mar 26, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Jul 02, 2017 5:34 AM EDT
defendant
John R. McGlinchey
Represented By
Theresa M. Asoklis
Collins Einhorn Farrell PC
contact info
defendant
Daniel E. Nickerson, Jr.
3599 W. Arbutus Drive
Okemos, MI 48864
defendant
John F. Van Bolt
Represented By
Rock A. Wood
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
defendant
Philip J. Thomas
Represented By
Michael Patrick Ashcraft
Plunkett Cooney (bloomfield Hills)
contact info
Jeffrey C. Gerish
Plunkett Cooney (bloomfield Hills)
contact info
defendant
Marvin Robertson
Represented By
Rock A. Wood
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
defendant
Angela Morgan
Represented By
Bonnie G. Toskey
Cohl Stoker & Toskey, P.C.
contact info
Timothy M. Perrone
Cohl Stoker Toskey & Mcglinchey PC
contact info
defendant
Richard Keusch
Represented By
Curtis Hadley
Willingham & Cote PC
contact info
defendant
Ingham County Circuit Court
Represented By
Bonnie G. Toskey
Cohl Stoker & Toskey, P.C.
contact info
Timothy M. Perrone
Cohl Stoker Toskey & Mcglinchey PC
contact info
defendant
Paul F. Fisher
Represented By
Matthew T. Nelson
Warner Norcross & Judd Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
William E. Collette
Represented By
Bonnie G. Toskey
Cohl Stoker & Toskey, P.C.
contact info
Timothy M. Perrone
Cohl Stoker Toskey & Mcglinchey PC
contact info
defendant
Cynthia C. Bullington
Represented By
Joseph E. Potchen
Mi Dept Attorney General (employ,elect,torts)
contact info
Katherine J. Bennett
Michigan Department Of Attorney General (enra)
contact info
plaintiff
Beverley R. Nettles
29716 Pipers Ln.
Farmington Hills, MI 48334
TERMINATED PARTIES
defendant
Michigan Supreme Court
Terminated: 06/23/2017
Represented By
Rock A. Wood
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
defendant
Larry S. Royster
Terminated: 03/23/2017
defendant
Michigan Supreme Court Clerk
Terminated: 03/23/2017
defendant
Michigan Attorney Grievance Commission
Terminated: 03/23/2017
defendant
Judicial Tenure Commission
Terminated: 03/23/2017
defendant
Alan M. Gershel
Terminated: 06/23/2017
Represented By
Joseph E. Potchen
Mi Dept Attorney General (employ,elect,torts)
contact info
Katherine J. Bennett
Michigan Department Of Attorney General (enra)
contact info
defendant
Attorney Discipline Board
Terminated: 03/23/2017
defendant
Mark A. Armitage
Terminated: 06/23/2017
Represented By
Rock A. Wood
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info

GPO Mar 26 2018
OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)

1. Former Ingham judge files federal lawsuit against Michigan Supreme Court (lansingstatejournal.com)
Submitted Mon 04/17/2017
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
116 116 appeal Supreme Court Letter Regarding Decision on Petition for Writ of Certiorari Wed 06/19 2:05 PM
LETTER from Supreme Court of the United States that the petition for writ of certiorari is denied re Notice of Appeal94 (clw)
Related: [-]