Original Case: 1:17-cv-00004

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:18-cv-01486
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2018
Last checked: Monday Apr 30, 2018 3:27 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
MICHIGAN SUPREME COURT
Represented By
Rock A. Wood
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CYNTHIA C. BULLINGTON, individually and in her official capacity as Assistant Deputy Grievance Administrator
Represented By
Joseph Edward Potchen
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Katherine Jean Bennett
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN F. VAN BOLT, individually and in his official capacity as Former Executive Director, Michigan Attorney Discipline Board
Represented By
Rock A. Wood
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
PAUL F. FISHER, individually and in his official capacity as Former Executive Director, Michigan Judicial Tenure Commission
Represented By
Matthew T. Nelson
Warner, Norcross & Judd
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE WILLIAM E. COLLETTE, individually and in his official capacity as Ingham County Circuit Court Judge
Represented By
Bonnie G. Toskey
Cohl, Stoker & Toskey
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
INGHAM COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT
Represented By
Bonnie G. Toskey
Cohl, Stoker & Toskey
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANGELA MORGAN
Represented By
Bonnie G. Toskey
Cohl, Stoker & Toskey
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN R. MCGLINCHEY, Attorney, individually and in his official capacity as Former Counsel Ingham County
Represented By
Theresa M. Asoklis
Collins Einhorn Farrell
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MARVIN ROBERTSON, Retired Judge, individually and in his official capacity as Informal Fact-Finder
Represented By
Rock A. Wood
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DANIEL E. NICKERSON, JR.
Represented By
Jeanne Vallez Barron
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
RICHARD KEUSCH
Represented By
Curtis R. Hadley
Willingham & Cote
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
PHILIP J. THOMAS, Attorney
Represented By
Jeffrey Charles Gerish
Plunkett Cooney
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BEVERLEY R. NETTLES
Represented By
Beverley R. Nettles
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2018 3:27 AM CDT
Friday, April 27, 2018
The case manager for this case is: Jill Colyer (JC)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Beverley R. Nettles. Transcript needed: n. (JC)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/11/2018;. appellee brief due 07/12/2018;. (JC)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Michigan Supreme Court, Marvin Robertson and John F. Van Bolt by Rock A. Wood. Certificate of Service: 04/27/2018. 18-1486 (RAW)
Related: [-]