Original Case: 1:14-cv-00309

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv-01012
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2017
Terminated:Feb 01, 2018
Last checked: Monday Aug 21, 2017 2:13 PM CDT
Defendant - Appellant
JOSEPH FOX, an individual
Represented By
Joseph Fox
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
PAUL SIMONS
Represented By
David Witowski
LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL D. SMITH, P.C.
contact info
Bilal Zaheer
LOCKE LORD LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 01 2018
Filed Nonprecedential Disposition PER CURIAM. The judgment is AFFIRMED and Foxâ??s motion to stay enforcement of the money judgment entered against him is DENIED. Diane P. Wood, Chief Judge; Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge and Amy C. Barrett, Circuit Judge [6900883-2] [6900875-2] [6900873-2] [6901087-1] [6901087] [17-1012]

Docket last updated: 05/08/2020 5:55 AM CDT
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 01/17/2017. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/13/2017 for Joseph Fox. [1] [6808896] 17-1012 (VG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 93 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court