Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Harry D Leinenweber
Case #: 1:14-cv-00309
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2014
Terminated:Dec 01, 2016
Case in other court:17-01012
Last checked: Monday Aug 21, 2017 2:14 PM CDT
Counter Claimant
Ditto Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Mark A. Stang
Stang-Law Firm
contact info
Dawn Marie Canty
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Jennifer Cecelia Ryan
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Daniel P. Shapiro
Katten Muchin Rosenman, LLP
contact info
Sanjay Shivpuri
Chuhak & Tecson, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Ditto Trade, Inc.
Represented By
Mark A. Stang
Stang-Law Firm
contact info
Dawn Marie Canty
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Jennifer Cecelia Ryan
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Daniel P. Shapiro
Katten Muchin Rosenman, LLP
contact info
Sanjay Shivpuri
Chuhak & Tecson, P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Joseph Fox
an individual 6444 East Spring Street Unit 624
Long Beach, CA 90815
Represented By
Mark A. Stang
Stang-Law Firm
contact info
John J. Ricci
Ricci Law Firm
contact info
Dawn Marie Canty
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Jennifer Cecelia Ryan
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Daniel P. Shapiro
Katten Muchin Rosenman, LLP
contact info
Sanjay Shivpuri
Chuhak & Tecson, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Paul Simons
Represented By
Bilal Zaheer
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Teresa A Sullivan
The Quinlan Law Firm, LLC
contact info
William Allen Woolley
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ditto Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Mark A. Stang
Stang-Law Firm
contact info
Dawn Marie Canty
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Jennifer Cecelia Ryan
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Daniel P. Shapiro
Katten Muchin Rosenman, LLP
contact info
Sanjay Shivpuri
Chuhak & Tecson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Ditto Trade, Inc.
Represented By
Mark A. Stang
Stang-Law Firm
contact info
Dawn Marie Canty
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Jennifer Cecelia Ryan
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Daniel P. Shapiro
Katten Muchin Rosenman, LLP
contact info
Sanjay Shivpuri
Chuhak & Tecson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Fox
an individual 6444 East Spring Street Unit 624
Long Beach, CA 90815
Represented By
Mark A. Stang
Stang-Law Firm
contact info
John J. Ricci
Ricci Law Firm
contact info
Ethan Emery White
Leonardmeyer LLP
contact info
Dawn Marie Canty
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Jennifer Cecelia Ryan
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Daniel P. Shapiro
Katten Muchin Rosenman, LLP
contact info
Sanjay Shivpuri
Chuhak & Tecson, P.C.
contact info
Michael Irving Leonard
Leonardmeyer LLP
contact info
Movant
Movant
Plaintiff
Paul Simons
Represented By
Michael D Smith
Law Office Of Michael D Smith P C
contact info
David T Van Der Laan
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Nathan Lollis
contact info
Bilal Zaheer
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Teresa A Sullivan
The Quinlan Law Firm, LLC
contact info
William Allen Woolley
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
David Witowski
Law Office Of Michael D. Smith, P.C.
contact info

GPO Aug 08 2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/8/2014:Mailed notice(wp, )
GPO Nov 19 2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/19/2014:Mailed notice(wp, )
GPO Apr 28 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/28/2015: Ruling date of 5/7/2015 is stricken.Mailed notice(wp, )
GPO May 02 2016
ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/2/2016:Mailed notice(wp, )
GPO Aug 11 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/11/2016:Mailed notice(wp, )

1. SEC Announces Award to Whistleblower in First Retaliation Case (sec.gov)
Submitted Fri 05/01/2015
2. Goldberg Kohn accuses former client of failing to pay $250K bill | Cook County (cookcountyrecord.com)
Submitted Wed 03/18/2015
3. Iggys House Down for the Count-- rentBits Blog (rentbits.com)
Submitted Sun 02/22/2015
4. Colorado sues Boulder financial talk show host (denverpost.com)
Submitted Tue 11/11/2014
5. SEC says ex-Marine bilked vets in Chicago hedge fund fraud (reuters.com)
Submitted Wed 06/04/2014
Docket last updated: 11/25/2021 7:53 AM CST
Thursday, January 16, 2014
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Arlander Keys. (meg, )
Related: [-]
1 1 53 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Paul Simons; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9109837.(Woolley, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 5 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit E,
Att: 6 4 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 7 11 pgs Exhibit G,
Att: 8 5 pgs Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sullivan, Teresa)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Paul Simons by William Allen Woolley (Woolley, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Paul Simons by Teresa A Sullivan (Sullivan, Teresa)
Related: [-]